MANHOLLAN v. UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: REBECCA MANHOLLAN
Defendant: UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2020cv01457
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Referring Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Response to Motion, #12 Brief in Opposition to Motion. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (ma)
November 19, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Henkle, Ashley)
November 19, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Henkle, Ashley)
November 6, 2020 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Monahan, Patricia)
November 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Meet and Confer, #2 Proposed Order) (Monahan, Patricia)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm)
October 26, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Christy Criswell Wiegand on 10/26/2020. (jmm)
October 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia A. Monahan on behalf of UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. (Monahan, Patricia)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Christy Criswell Wiegand for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn J. Horan no longer assigned to case. All previously scheduled deadlines and proceedings shall remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. See order at 2:20-mc-1451. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 10/22/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (sgn)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jgb)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/22/2020. (jgb)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5949278), filed by REBECCA MANHOLLAN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MANHOLLAN v. UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED SERVICE AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Patricia A. Monahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA MANHOLLAN
Represented By: Ashley Marie Henkle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?