PENDLETON v. ZAPPALA et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. PENDLETON
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL JOSH SHAPIRO and STEPHEN A. ZAPPALA, JR.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01735
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Kim R Gibson
Referring Judge: Keith A Pesto
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #9 Motion to Withdraw filed by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. The plaintiff's motion to withdraw the complaint can be taken to be a notice of voluntary dismissal under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Clerk is to mark CASE CLOSED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 12/7/2020. (bgs)
December 8, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Withdraw #4 Complaint by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (bgs)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #6 Motion for Order to Show Cause and as more fully stated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 11/30/2020. (bgs)
November 19, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION in Support re #6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. (elt)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for an Immediate Preliminary and/or Permanent Injunction by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. Motion(s) referred to Keith A. Pesto. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Envelope) (elt)
November 18, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #4 Complaint filed by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON, recommendingthat the complaint should be dismissed without leave to amend; Objections to R&R due by 12/2/2020 Objections to R&R for Unregistered ECF Users due by 12/7/2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 11/18/2020. (plp)
November 18, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against JOSH SHAPIRO, STEPHEN A. ZAPPALA, JR ), filed by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (plp)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the Clerk shall assign this matter to Judge Gibson with the reference to Judge Pesto for pretrial proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Keith A. Pesto on 11/18/2020. (plp)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. (elt)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by MICHAEL J. PENDLETON. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (elt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2020: #2 Complaint) (elt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/17/2020: #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Envelope) (elt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENDLETON v. ZAPPALA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATTORNEY GENERAL JOSH SHAPIRO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEPHEN A. ZAPPALA, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL J. PENDLETON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?