SOLLAZZO v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Plaintiff: ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2020cv01902
Filed: December 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ponzo, Aaron)
January 22, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Ponzo, Aaron)
January 20, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron M. Ponzo on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Ponzo, Aaron)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion for P. Matthew Darby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/13/21. (jad)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion for H. David Leibensperger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/13/21. (jad)
January 13, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: the person wanting admission should filed the motion. CORRECTION: using the eratta event, refile the motions with the signature of attorney to be admitted. This message is for informational purposes only. (sdp)
January 12, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for attorney P. Matthew Darby to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6239389) by ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Justin)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney H. David Leibensperger to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # BPAWDC-6239351) by ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order) (Lewis, Justin)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of this date of this Order, counsel shall confer and submit to the Court the following documents: (a) A written report required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f), in the format set forth in Appendix LCvR 16.1 A (current form) to the Local Rule 16.1.1B; and, (b) A stipulation selecting an ADR process (pursuant to Local Rule 16.2) (current form). Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 1/4/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
January 4, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement identifying Norfolk Southern Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
December 30, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY served on 12/15/2020, answer due 1/5/2021. (Lewis, Justin)
December 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Lawson Johnston on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Johnston, J.)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Clements on behalf of NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY. (Clements, Scott)
December 15, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (sdp)
December 14, 2020 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Lewis, Justin)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 12/10/20. (jad)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6123619), filed by ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOLLAZZO v. NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORFOLK SOUTHERN RAILWAY COMPANY
Represented By: Scott D. Clements
Represented By: J. Lawson Johnston
Represented By: Aaron M. Ponzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT J. SOLLAZZO
Represented By: Justin R. Lewis
Represented By: P. Matthew Darby
Represented By: Hans David Leibensperger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?