SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: JAMES MONSEES, ADAM BOWEN, JOHN DOES 1-100, HOYOUNG HUH, RIAZ VALANI, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, JUUL LABS, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, NU MARK LLC and PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01984
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Email) (Shuber, Jordan)
January 20, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-00466, filed 01/20/2021 (jv)
January 14, 2021 Case electronically transferred to Northern District of California. (jv)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY (main document), ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Attachments: #1 Summons Re-issued as to Altia Client Services, #2 Summons Re-issued as to Altria Group Inc., #3 Summons Re-issued as to Adam Bowen, #4 Summons Re-issued as to Hoyoung Huh, #5 Summons Re-issued as to James Monsees, #6 Summons Re-issued as to Juul Labs Inc, #7 Summons Re-issued as to as to Nicholas Pritzker, #8 Summons Re-issued as to NU Mark LLC, #9 Summons Re-issued as to Phillip Morris USA, Inc., #10 Summons Re-issued as to Riaz Valanic) (jv)
January 13, 2021 Filing 8 PRAECIPE to Re-Issue Summons by SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Amended Case Management Order No. 3, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (Shuber, Jordan) Modified on 1/13/2021 to indicate that this entry is PRAECIPE to Re-Issue (jv).
January 12, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (jv)
January 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Shuber, Jordan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 5 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jv)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jv)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Summons) (King, Thomas)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M. Hoffman on behalf of SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Hoffman, Matthew)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JOHN DOES 1-100, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6181378), filed by SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MONSEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOYOUNG HUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIAZ VALANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS PRITZKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU MARK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENECA VALLEY SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Matthew M. Hoffman
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?