RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT
Defendant: JAMES MONSEES, ADAM BOWEN, JOHN DOES 1-100, RIAZ VALANI, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, JUUL LABS, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC. and HOYOUNG HUH
Case Number: 2:2020cv01989
Filed: December 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service Email) (Shuber, Jordan)
January 26, 2021 Remark: Case transferred from Pennsylvania Western has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:21-cv-00467, filed 01/20/2021. (jd)
January 14, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of NORTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. (jd)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (jd)
January 13, 2021 Filing 9 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Amended Case Management Order No. 3, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons) (Shuber, Jordan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Shuber, Jordan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order received from Northern District of California. (jd)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 Conditional Transfer Order received from the Judicial Panel on Multi-District Litigation. (jd)
January 5, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Praecipe to Issue Summons. ERROR: Summons not complete. CORRECTION: There must be one summons per defendant with name and address of defendant being served. Please file an Errata attaching one complete summons per defendant. Please see "Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 4. Summons". ACTION REQUIRED (jd)
January 4, 2021 Filing 5 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT (Attachments: #1 Summons) (King, Thomas)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael I. Levin on behalf of RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Levin, Michael)
December 29, 2020 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #2 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Document request for two entries of Appearance. CORRECTION: Michael I. Levin must file his own Entry of Appearance. This message is for informational purposes only. (jd)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Sweeney on behalf of RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Sweeney, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES, ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY, ALTRIA GROUP, INC., ADAM BOWEN, HOYOUNG HUH, JOHN DOES 1-100, JUUL LABS, INC., JAMES MONSEES, NU MARK LLC, PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC., NICHOLAS PRITZKER, RIAZ VALANI (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-618189), filed by RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT v. JUUL LABS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES MONSEES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM BOWEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIAZ VALANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA GROUP DISTRIBUTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALTRIA CLIENT SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL LABS, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NICHOLAS PRITZKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NU MARK LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIP MORRIS USA, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOYOUNG HUH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RINGGOLD SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Represented By: Michael T Sweeney
Represented By: Michael I. Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?