SERENARI v. PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Plaintiff: STACY SERENARI
Defendant: PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISGTRICT and PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Case Number: 2:2020cv01994
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ira Weiss on behalf of PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Weiss, Ira)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this document. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (dms)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Gabriel on behalf of PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT. (Gabriel, Brian)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STACY SERENARI. PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 12/29/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (Martoccio, Gary)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STACY SERENARI. (Martoccio, Gary)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISGTRICT (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6184171), filed by STACY SERENARI. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SERENARI v. PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACY SERENARI
Represented By: Gary Martoccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISGTRICT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PITTSBURGH SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Ira Weiss
Represented By: Brian P. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?