SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST v. FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST
Defendant: FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA doing business as SONS AND DAUGHTERS OF ITALY LODGE 454
Case Number: 2:2021cv00031
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (MacBride, Jonathan)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/11/2021. (jmm)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 1/11/2021. (jmm)
January 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
January 8, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Selective Insurance Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. (MacBride, Jonathan)
January 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA (jjg)
January 8, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 1/15/2021. (jjg)
January 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6225681), filed by SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST v. FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SELECTIVE INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE SOUTHEAST
Represented By: Jonathan R. MacBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FRANCESO FLORENTINO CONCORDIA doing business as SONS AND DAUGHTERS OF ITALY LODGE 454
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?