HALL v. ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: MARIA HALL
Defendant: ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00154
Filed: February 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the initial Case Management Conference, and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/28/21. (Attachments: #1 (Exhibit, Article re Mediation) (jhi)
March 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set before Judge Cathy Bissoon, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/28/21. (jhi)
March 26, 2021 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement identifying MetLife, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Beil, Craig)
March 26, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Beil, Craig)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Craig W. Beil on behalf of ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. (Beil, Craig)
March 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by R. Sean O'Connell on behalf of ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY. (O'Connell, R.)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/2/21. (jhi)
February 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6298316), filed by MARIA HALL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HALL v. ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECONOMY PREFERRED INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Craig W. Beil
Represented By: R. Sean O'Connell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA HALL
Represented By: Brandon Russell Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?