FLECKENSTEIN v. SAUL
Plaintiff: BRUCE FLECKENSTEIN
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 2:2021cv00212
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #3 Complaint. Correct document attached. (sdp)
March 17, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by BRUCE FLECKENSTEIN. ANDREW SAUL served on 2/25/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Quatrini, Adam)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (sdp)
February 18, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against ANDREW SAUL ), filed by BRUCE FLECKENSTEIN. (sdp)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 2/17/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (et)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by BRUCE FLECKENSTEIN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLECKENSTEIN v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRUCE FLECKENSTEIN
Represented By: Adam N Quatrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?