HOMER v. MONZA et al
Plaintiff: AIDEN HOMER, ELIJAH WINCHESTER and AIDAN HOMER
Defendant: SGT. HARRIS, JENNIFER MONZA, C/O SLADE and WARDEN WILLIAM SCHOUPPE
Case Number: 2:2021cv00239
Filed: February 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2021 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER re #18 Correspondence from AIDAN HOMER regarding service of documents and requesting to correct the spelling of his name and inmate number. The docket has been corrected to reflect the correct spelling of Plaintiff's first name and his correct inmate number. Plaintiff was granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis on 3/9/21 #8 . Under the IFP statute, the Court shall issue and serve all process. 298 USC sect. 1915(d). Therefore, to the extent Plaintiff had someone serve his complaint on the defendants, such service is improper. Plaintiff met his obligations as required by the Order issued on 3-9-21 9 , and on 3/25/21, the Court directed the USMS to serve the defendants. #17 Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/1/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 18 Correspondence regarding service of documents and requesting to correct the spelling of his name (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, along with this Order, to Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, with costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/25/2021. (cmc)
March 19, 2021 Filing 16 Remark: UNSEALED CORRESPONDENCE (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER indicating that, for the reasons set forth therein, #12 the MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal without payment of fees by AIDAN HOMER is denied. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/10/2021. (bsc) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jd).
March 10, 2021 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER denying #11 MOTION to Produce/Subpoena of Records by AIDEN HOMER as premature. This case was just recently filed and service has not been made. Any requests for discovery are premature and will not be entertained until after Defendants have filed a responsive pleading to the Complaint. If the case survives dispositive motions, the Court will issue a case management order detailing the Court's procedures for discovery in a pro se civil rights case. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/10/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
March 10, 2021 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against C/O SLADE, JENNIFER MONZA, WILLIAM SCHOUPPE, SGT. HARRIS, filed by AIDEN HOMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit memo) (jd)
March 9, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT by AIDAN HOMER to #10 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (jd) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jd).
March 9, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Service by U.S. Marshal without payment of fees by AIDEN HOMER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
March 9, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Produce/Subpoena of Records by AIDEN HOMER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FOR SERVICE DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff shall provide the Court with proper instructions for service upon each of the named defendants listed in the Complaint, including a U.S. Marshal Form 285, Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons (AO Form 398), and Waiver of the Service of Summons (AO Form 399). A copy of each of these forms is required to be completed for each of the named defendants on or before 3/31/2021. Failure to comply with this Order may result in dismissal of this action. No extensions will be granted without good cause. A courtesy copy of the service forms is included with this Order. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/9/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
March 9, 2021 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/9/2021. (cmc)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to 6 Order filed by AIDAN HOMER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jd).
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER - ELIJAH WASHINGTON is identified as a named plaintiff in this case in both the caption and Paragraph I(A) of the Complaint. However, the statement of the claim describes an incident involving only Aiden Homer. On or before 3/12/2021, plaintiffs shall clarify for the Court whether ELIJAH WASHINGTON was intended to be a plaintiff in this case. The parties are advised that each named plaintiff will be assessed the total filing fee of $350.00. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/24/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bsc)
February 20, 2021 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/20/21. (bsc)
February 20, 2021 Filing 4 CORRECTIVE ENTRY re #3 Standing Practice Order for Pro Se Civil Rights Cases. Incorrect Order attached. (bsc)
February 20, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 2/20/2021. (bsc) Document removed from public see. See Corrective Entry at ECF 4. (bsc).
February 19, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by AIDAN HOMER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jd).
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by AIDAN HOMER. (Attachments: #1 AUTHORIZATION, #2 Complaint/Habeas Petition lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #3 MEMO, #4 Envelope) (jd) Modified on 3/31/2021 (jd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HOMER v. MONZA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT. HARRIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JENNIFER MONZA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O SLADE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WARDEN WILLIAM SCHOUPPE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDEN HOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIJAH WINCHESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AIDAN HOMER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?