MCALLISTER v. CONAIR CORPORATION et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCALLISTER
Defendant: CONAIR CORPORATION and TARGET CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2021cv00262
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Mediation by EUGENE F. SCANLON, JR. Mediation Date 5-12-21 @ 10:00am (Scanlon, Eugene)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The Honorable Eugene Scanlon is appointed as mediator; The ADR conference(s) shall be concluded before 6/7/21 unless extended by order of the Court; William F. Goodrich, Esquire is designated as lead counsel and shall be responsible for working with the parties and the neutral to coordinate an agreeable date, time and location for the initial ADR conference; It is the responsibility of lead counsel to ensure that notice of the date, time and location of the mediation has been electronically filed with the Court on or before 4/21/21. The Court shall be promptly noticed of any rescheduled date for the scheduled conference. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/7/21. (jg)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions to Amend/Add Parties due by 5/7/21; The parties shall complete the ADR process they selected by 6/7/21. Discovery is not stayed pending ADR; Fact Discovery ends 9/6/21; Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 8/5/21; Defendants' Expert Reports due by 8/25/21; Expert Depositions to be completed by 9/17/21; A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for 9/21/21 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville; At least 5 business days prior to the post-discovery status conference, the parties shall file on the docket an updated joint pre-conference statement. See Hon. Robert J. Colville Practices and Procedures, III.A.2. Any party may supplement the joint pre-conference statement with an individually filed voluntary position statement. See Hon. Robert J. Colville Practices and Procedures, III.A.3. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/7/21. (jg)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER entered pursuant to Rule 502(d) of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/7/21. (jg)
April 7, 2021 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 4/7/21; Appropriate Orders to follow. (Court Reporter: None) (jg)
April 1, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE Joint Pre-Conference Statement by MICHAEL MCALLISTER (Goodrich, William)
April 1, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Goodrich, William)
April 1, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by MICHAEL MCALLISTER. (Goodrich, William)
March 9, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bianca M Dinardo on behalf of MICHAEL MCALLISTER. (Dinardo, Bianca)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jake Oresick on behalf of CONAIR CORPORATION. (Oresick, Jake)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CONAIR CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TARGET CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ORDER indicating that the parties' Rule 26 Meeting Report and Stipulation Selecting ADR Process are due by 3/31/21; A Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference is set for 4/7/21 at 11:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville; At least 5 business days prior to the Initial Case Management Conference, the parties shall file on the docket a joint pre-conference statement. See Hon. Robert J. Colville Practices and Procedures, III.A.2. Any party may supplement the joint pre-conference statement with an individually filed voluntary position statement. See Hon. Robert J. Colville Practices and Procedures, III.A.3. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/3/21. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jg)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/3/21. (jg)
March 3, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by CONAIR CORPORATION, TARGET CORPORATION. (Sneath, Henry)
February 25, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. This message is for informational purposes only. Disclosure Statement due by 3/4/2021. (sdp)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny county, case number GD21-760 with Jury demand Copies attached: state court record (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6365673), filed by CONAIR CORPORATION, TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCALLISTER v. CONAIR CORPORATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CONAIR CORPORATION
Represented By: Henry M. Sneath
Represented By: Jake Oresick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION
Represented By: Henry M. Sneath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MCALLISTER
Represented By: William F. Goodrich
Represented By: Bianca M Dinardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?