S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC. v. CLEARFIBER, INC. et al
Plaintiff: S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC.
Defendant: HENSON, LLC, TIMOTHY CHAD HENSON, CLEARFIBER, INC. and DBI NETWORKS, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00408
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. The Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 11:00 a.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED for 6/9/2021 at 11:30 a.m. before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 5/18/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
May 5, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CLEARFIBER, INC., DBI NETWORKS, LLC, TIMOTHY CHAD HENSON, HENSON, LLC. (Skeen, Brocton)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 Proposed Rule 26(f) report (av)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 IMPORTANT NOTICE REGARDING TELEPHONE PROCEEDINGS. (av)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/28/2021; Stipulation Selecting ADR process due by 5/28/2021; Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/9/2021 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 4/29/2021. (av)
April 29, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 5/6/2021. (ma)
April 28, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by CLEARFIBER, INC., DBI NETWORKS, LLC, TIMOTHY CHAD HENSON, HENSON, LLC. (Skeen, Brocton)
April 16, 2021 Filing 4 RICO Case Statement by S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC.. (Llaguno, Joy)
April 1, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC.. (Llaguno, Joy)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CLEARFIBER, INC., DBI NETWORKS, LLC, TIMOTHY CHAD HENSON, HENSON, LLC (ma)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CLEARFIBER, INC., DBI NETWORKS, LLC, TIMOTHY CHAD HENSON, HENSON, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6433373), filed by S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (ma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC. v. CLEARFIBER, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HENSON, LLC
Represented By: Brocton G Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TIMOTHY CHAD HENSON
Represented By: Brocton G Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CLEARFIBER, INC.
Represented By: Brocton G Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DBI NETWORKS, LLC
Represented By: Brocton G Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S & S COMMUNICATION SERVICES, INC.
Represented By: Joy D. Llaguno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?