WALLER v. THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC
Plaintiff: TAMIKA WALLER
Defendant: THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00519
Filed: April 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 6/26/2021; Motions to Add New Parties and/or Amend Pleadings due by 8/16/2021; ADR to take place by 7/12/2021; Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2021; Confidential Position Letters due by 11/16/2021; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/17/2021. (jmm)
June 17, 2021 Filing 15 Minute Entry for Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/16/2021 before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. (Court Reporter: None) (jmm)
June 16, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TAMIKA WALLER. (Steenland, Kyle)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle H. Steenland on behalf of TAMIKA WALLER. (Steenland, Kyle)
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STRIKING #10 Stipulation Selecting ADR Process. The parties are directed to refile an ADR stipulation selecting a date certain for the mediation session that is within sixty (60) days of the Initial Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/10/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ward, Joshua)
June 9, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by TAMIKA WALLER. (Ward, Joshua) Document hidden from public view per 12 Order. Modified on 6/11/2021 (jmm).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2021 at 9:00 AM via Teleconference before Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 6/2/2021. Rule 26 Meeting Report and ADR Stipulation due by 6/9/2021. Confidential Position Letters due by 6/11/2021. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/21/2021. (jmm)
May 10, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Independent Contractor Agreement) (McCrea, Jacob)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC's answer is due on or before 5/10/2021. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/23/2021. (jmm)
April 22, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Motion to Dismiss by THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (McCrea, Jacob)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 4/21/2021. (jmm)
April 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC. (McCrea, Jacob)
April 20, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal,. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 4/27/2021. (jd) Modified on 4/28/2021 (jd).
April 19, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY, case number GD-20-10076 with BOTH Copies attached: LWER COURT COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number BPAWDC-6467183), filed by THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Lower Court Documents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALLER v. THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMIKA WALLER
Represented By: Joshua P. Ward
Represented By: Kyle H. Steenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE HABILITATION GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Jacob C. McCrea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?