N.G. et al v. INSTANT BRANDS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: N.G., BRITTANY GONZALEZ and O.C. a minor
Defendant: INSTANT BRANDS, INC. and TARGET CORPORATION doing business as TARGET STORES
Case Number: 2:2021cv00754
Filed: June 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by N.G., BRITTANY GONZALEZ, O.C. a minor. Answer due from TARGET CORPORATION on 8/9/21 and Answer due from INSTANT BRANDS, INC. on 8/11/21. (Present, Benjamin) Modified text on 7/27/2021. (kss)
July 19, 2021 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by INSTANT BRANDS, INC.. (Callahan, Dennis)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TARGET CORPORATION. (Lesinski, Joseph)
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis R. Callahan on behalf of INSTANT BRANDS, INC.. (Callahan, Dennis)
July 15, 2021 Filing 14 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by INSTANT BRANDS, INC. Answer due from INSTANT BRANDS, INC. on 8/11/2021. (Callahan, Dennis)
July 15, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/22/2021. (jv)
July 15, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #11 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/22/2021. (jv)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claims filed by TARGET CORPORATION. (Lesinski, Joseph)
July 12, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Punitive Damages Claims by TARGET CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Movant, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit A) (Lesinski, Joseph)
July 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph V. Lesinski on behalf of TARGET CORPORATION. (Lesinski, Joseph)
July 6, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Shanin Specter on behalf of BRITTANY GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Specter, Shanin)
July 6, 2021 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for HAGUE SERVICE REQUEST NOTICE & SUMMARY OF DOCUMENTS, SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION, COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, NOTICE THAT CASE HAS BEEN PLACED INTO USDC WDPA ADR PROGRAM, ORDER REGARDING MOTIONS served on INSTANT BRANDS, INC. on 06/30/2021, filed by BRITTANY GONZALEZ. (Present, Benjamin)
June 30, 2021 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from TARGET CORPORATION on 7/12/2021. (jmm)
June 25, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for SUMMONS; COMPLAINT; COVER SHEET; NOTICE; ORDER served on TARGET CORPORATION d/b/a TARGET STORES on 06/21/2021, filed by BRITTANY GONZALEZ. (Present, Benjamin)
June 10, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to INSTANT BRANDS, INC. (Main document), TARGET CORPORATION (Attachments: #1 Summons as to Target Corporation) (jv)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/9/2021. (jmm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
June 9, 2021 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRITTANY GONZALEZ (Attachments: #1 Summons SUMMONS) (Present, Benjamin)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by BRITTANY GONZALEZ (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons) (Present, Benjamin)
June 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INSTANT BRANDS, INC., TARGET CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6552081), filed by N.G., BRITTANY GONZALEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N.G. et al v. INSTANT BRANDS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N.G.
Represented By: Benjamin O Present
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRITTANY GONZALEZ
Represented By: Benjamin O Present
Represented By: Shanin Specter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O.C. a minor
Represented By: Benjamin O Present
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INSTANT BRANDS, INC.
Represented By: Dennis R. Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TARGET CORPORATION doing business as TARGET STORES
Represented By: Joseph V. Lesinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?