SAVAGE v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: WALTER SAVAGE
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY doing business as GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00755
Filed: June 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Nora Barry Fischer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand. This case is REMANDED to the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED and send a certified copy of this Order to the Prothonotary of the Court of Common Pleas of Allegheny County, forthwith. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/30/21. (cjo)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hudock, Joseph)
June 30, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Proposed Order was made part of main document. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that in future proposed orders are to be made attachments to the main document. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
June 30, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #5 Motion to Remand. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support of Motion. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support re #5 Motion to Remand filed by WALTER SAVAGE. (kss)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re: #5 Motion to Remand and Brief in Support filed by Plaintiff, Defendant GEICO shall file a Response to said Motion and Brief by 7/7/2021. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/29/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdk)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by WALTER SAVAGE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Brief in Support) (Halesey, Christopher) Attachment #1 removed from public view and refiled at #8 . Modified text on 6/30/2021. (kss)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (Details more fully stated in said order). Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 6/11/21. (cjo)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
June 9, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying Berkshire Hathaway as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Hudock, Joseph)
June 9, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD 21-005803 with Jury Demand Copies attached: Complaint, Notice to Defend (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6553162), filed by GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SAVAGE v. GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY doing business as GEICO SECURE INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Joseph A. Hudock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WALTER SAVAGE
Represented By: Christopher M. Halesey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?