BLUM et al v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Plaintiff: JEFFREY P BLUM and ZARA J BLUM
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. doing business as NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00782
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Rende, Bruce)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Rende, Bruce)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference filed by ZARA J BLUM, JEFFREY P BLUM. Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference previously set for 9/8/21 is rescheduled to 9/23/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. The court will email the counsel the dial in information for the call. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 7/16/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Proposed Order re #10 Motion to Continue Case Management Conference by JEFFREY P BLUM, ZARA J BLUM. (Gelman, Bruce)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Case Management Conference by JEFFREY P BLUM, ZARA J BLUM. (Gelman, Bruce)
July 13, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Motion to Continue. ERROR: Proposed Order was not attached. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file a proposed order by using the Proposed Order event and linking it to the document in question. (sdp)
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF in Opposition re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by JEFFREY P BLUM, ZARA J BLUM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nationwide Homeowners Policy Cover Page, #2 Exhibit Nationwide Homeowners Policy Table of Contents) (Gelman, Bruce)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER: TELEPHONIC Initial Case Management set for 9/8/2021 at 02:00 PM before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Rule 26 Meeting to be conducted on or before 7/20/2021. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/10/2021. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/29/21. (cjo)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ON MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 6/29/21. (cjo)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF in Support re #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Rende, Bruce)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rende, Bruce)
June 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua R. Guthridge on behalf of NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.. (Guthridge, Joshua)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (cww)
June 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County Court of Common Pleas, case number GD-20-8097 with Jury Trial Demanded (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6564769), filed by NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (cww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLUM et al v. NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY P BLUM
Represented By: Bruce S. Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZARA J BLUM
Represented By: Bruce S. Gelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONWIDE MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. doing business as NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Bruce E. Rende
Represented By: Joshua R. Guthridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?