APPLEGATE v. BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.
Plaintiff: WAYNE APPLEGATE
Defendant: BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00791
Filed: June 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 216
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of this date of this Order, counsel shall confer and submit to the Court the following documents: (a) A written report required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(f), in the format set forth in Appendix LCvR 16.1 A (current form) to the Local Rule 16.1.1B; and, (b) A stipulation selecting an ADR process (pursuant to Local Rule 16.2) (current form). Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 8/11/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
August 10, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Tennant, Emma)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DISMISSING #9 Motion to Dismiss. Based on #20 Amended Complaint, said motion is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/28/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
July 27, 2021 Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P. on 8/10/2021 (jjg)
July 27, 2021 Filing 20 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P. BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P. answer due 8/10/2021, filed by WAYNE APPLEGATE. (Dunlap, Andrew) Modified text on 7/28/2021. (jjg)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #17 Motion for Carol A. Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/15/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
July 15, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D. Shepard on behalf of BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Shepard, Mark)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Carl A Fitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # BPAWDC-6609373) by WAYNE APPLEGATE. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order) (Fitz, Carl)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of WAYNE APPLEGATE. (Dunlap, Andrew)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William F. Goodrich on behalf of WAYNE APPLEGATE. (Goodrich, William)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Geist on behalf of WAYNE APPLEGATE. (Geist, Joshua)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Jon Alexander Bluebond to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/14/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Emily Philadelphia Tennant to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 7/14/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bdb)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying Buckeye Partners, L.P. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Meacham, Molly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Meacham, Molly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Meacham, Molly)
July 13, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jon Alexander Bluebond to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6606228) by BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Bluebond, Jon)
July 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Emma Philadelphia Tennant to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6606209) by BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order) (Tennant, Emma)
June 29, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by WAYNE APPLEGATE. BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P. served on 6/22/2021, answer due 7/13/2021. (Josephson, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (bdb)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 6/21/21. (bdb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (bdb)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P. (jjg)
June 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6566995), filed by WAYNE APPLEGATE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: APPLEGATE v. BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BUCKEYE PARTNERS, L.P.
Represented By: Emma Philadelphia Tennant
Represented By: Jon A. Bluebond
Represented By: Mark D. Shepard
Represented By: Molly E. Meacham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE APPLEGATE
Represented By: Michael A. Josephson
Represented By: Andrew W. Dunlap
Represented By: Carl A. Fitz
Represented By: Joshua P. Geist
Represented By: William F. Goodrich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?