USA v. $21,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: $21,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Case Number: 2:2021cv00835
Filed: June 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 by USA (Lew, David) Modified text on 8/16/2021. (elt)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 Seizure Warrant Returned Executed. Served on 21,000 on 7/16/2021. (elt)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 WARRANT of Action in REM issued (elt)
July 7, 2021 Filing 2 Request to Issue a Warrant for Arrest in Action in Rem by USA. (Lew, David)
June 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against $21,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY ), filed by USA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. $21,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $21,000 IN UNITED STATES CURRENCY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: David Lew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?