GRIFFIN et al v. LEHMAN et al
Plaintiff: RICHARD L. GRIFFIN and LORI ANN GRIFFIN
Defendant: M.D. JOHN D. LEHMAN, HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC. doing business as HVMG ORTHO, HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., VALLEY MEDICAL FACILITIES, INC. doing business as HERITAGE VALLEY BEAVER HOSPITAL and HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC. doing business as HVMG-ORTHO
Case Number: 2:2021cv00866
Filed: July 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Referring Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. VALLEY MEDICAL FACILITIES, INC. waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (McClelland, Regis)
August 11, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (McClelland, Regis)
August 11, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (McClelland, Regis) Modified text on 8/12/2021 to add service information. (lar)
August 10, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #14 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: The date the waiver was sent was blank. CORRECTION: Refile the completed Waiver of Service as an Errata and link it to the original Waiver of Service. (lar)
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. waiver sent on 7/9/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (McClelland, Regis) Modified text on 8/13/2021 to remove from public view. Waiver was refiled at #15 . (lar)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Lagnese on behalf of LORI ANN GRIFFIN, RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. (Lagnese, Paul)
July 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin M. Gottwald on behalf of HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC., VALLEY MEDICAL FACILITIES, INC.. (Gottwald, Justin)
July 30, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Defendant HV Beaver Hospital by Regis M. McClelland on behalf of RICHARD L. GRIFFIN (McClelland, Regis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Defendant HV Health System by Regis M. McClelland on behalf of RICHARD L. GRIFFIN (McClelland, Regis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Defendant HVMG-Ortho group by Regis M. McClelland on behalf of RICHARD L. GRIFFIN (McClelland, Regis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Merit as to Defendant Lehman by Regis M. McClelland on behalf of RICHARD L. GRIFFIN (McClelland, Regis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. JOHN D. LEHMAN waiver sent on 7/21/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (McClelland, Regis)
July 30, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Regis M. McClelland on behalf of RICHARD L. GRIFFIN. (McClelland, Regis)
July 30, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #6 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Signature on document and filer do not match. CORRECTION: Attorney advised of signature requirements. Attorney to resubmit the document using the Errata event. (lar)
July 13, 2021 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jg)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/13/21. (jg)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jg)
July 13, 2021 Judge Robert J. Colville added. Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (lyk)
July 8, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC., JOHN D. LEHMAN, VALLEY MEDICAL FACILITIES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons John Lehman, #2 Summons HV Health System, #3 Summons HV Beaver Hospital) (lar)
July 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC., JOHN D. LEHMAN, VALLEY MEDICAL FACILITIES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6595929), filed by RICHARD L. GRIFFIN, LORI ANN GRIFFIN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GRIFFIN et al v. LEHMAN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD L. GRIFFIN
Represented By: Regis M. McClelland
Represented By: Paul A. Lagnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI ANN GRIFFIN
Represented By: Regis M. McClelland
Represented By: Paul A. Lagnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. JOHN D. LEHMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC. doing business as HVMG ORTHO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE VALLEY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.
Represented By: Justin M. Gottwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VALLEY MEDICAL FACILITIES, INC. doing business as HERITAGE VALLEY BEAVER HOSPITAL
Represented By: Justin M. Gottwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HERITAGE VALLEY MULTISPECIALTY GROUP, INC. doing business as HVMG-ORTHO
Represented By: Justin M. Gottwald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?