ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK et al v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, KLINGENSMITH, INC., PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PROVIDER PPI LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL doing business as WEST PENN HOSPITAL doing business as FORBES HOSPITAL, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC. and CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C.
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2021cv01011
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2021 Filing 64 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
September 24, 2021 Filing 63 MOTION for attorney Patrick F. Hofer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6726013) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Hofer, Patrick)
September 24, 2021 Filing 62 MOTION for attorney Jared K. Clapper to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6725949) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Clapper, Jared)
September 24, 2021 Filing 61 MOTION for attorney Timothy A. Carroll to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6725944) by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Carroll, Timothy)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. The Motion for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand (Doc. #59 ) is GRANTED, and the Reply attached to their Motion is deemed filed. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/22/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk)
September 22, 2021 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand, #2 Proposed Order) (Louik, Matthew)
September 10, 2021 Filing 58 DECLARATION re #56 Response to Motion by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY Affiant: Tara Stanley. (Bove, Louis)
September 10, 2021 Filing 57 BRIEF in Opposition re #9 Motion to Remand,,,,, filed by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Bove, Louis)
September 10, 2021 Filing 56 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand filed by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Order granting in part and denying in part #8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Deadline for Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Allegheny Health Network's Claims Motions motion to stay, as follows: Defendant's obligation to to answer, move or respond to the Complaint is held in abeyance pending resolution of Plaintiff's motion to remand. The Court sees no benefit to resolving 12(b) motion(s) at this juncture, when the matter of remand due to jurisdictional issues is a threshold determination that may cause the 12(b) motion(s) to be moot. The Court will set additional deadlines if and as appropriate upon resolution of Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/31/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk)
August 30, 2021 Filing 54 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC.. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 53 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 52 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 51 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 50 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 49 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 48 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 47 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 46 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 45 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 44 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 43 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 42 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 41 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by REGIONAL HEART NETWORK. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 40 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PROVIDER PPI LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 39 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 38 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 37 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 36 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 35 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 34 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MONROEVILLE ASC LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 33 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 32 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by KLINGENSMITH, INC.. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 31 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 30 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by HMPG PHARMACY LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 29 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 28 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C.. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 27 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 26 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 25 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network and Quest Diagnostics Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 24 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Heath Network and Quest Diagnostics Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 23 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 22 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 21 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by ALLEGHENY CLINIC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement identifying Allegheny Health Network as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AHN EMERUS LLC. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 14 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Remand of James W. Rohrbaugh by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Remand of Dr. Paul S. Holley, MD by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Remand of Karen Surkala by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 11 DECLARATION re #9 MOTION to Remand of Kathleen Hardt by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 10 BRIEF in Support re #9 Motion to Remand,,,,, filed by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Louik, Matthew)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by AHN EMERUS LLC, AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC, ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER, ALLEGHENY CLINIC, ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC, ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC, ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL, CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES, CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C., GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER, HMPG PHARMACY LLC, JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP, KLINGENSMITH, INC., MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, MONROEVILLE ASC LLC, NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC, PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC, PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC, PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC, PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH, PROVIDER PPI LLC, REGIONAL HEART NETWORK, SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER, SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM, SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC., SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC, SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC, TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP, WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC, WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC., WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC., WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC, WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Louik, Matthew)
August 26, 2021 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay the Deadline for Defendant's Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Allegheny Health Network's Claims by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
August 10, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED DOCUMENT by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Revised Notice of Removal. Defendant shall file the amended Notice attached to its Motion on or before 8/13/21. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/10/21. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cyk)
August 9, 2021 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Revised Notice of Removal by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Table of Contents for Exhibits, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY Answer due from AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY on 9/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying Zurich American Insurance Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Bove, Louis)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 8/3/21. (jhi)
August 2, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Notice of Removal. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2021. (jjg)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-21-7091 with Jury Demand. Copies attached: Complaint (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6633783), filed by AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service) (jjg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK et al v. AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK SURGERY CENTER-BETHEL PARK LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHN EMERUS LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AHN EMERUS WESTMORELAND, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GROVE CITY MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WOLF CREEK MEDICAL ASSOCIATES
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONROEVILLE ASC LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLINGENSMITH, INC.
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYSICIAN PARTNERS OF WESTERN PA LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PROVIDER PPI LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PDL DISTRIBUTION SERVICES LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HMPG PHARMACY LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEXFORD MEDICAL MALL LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT VINCENT REHAB SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT VINCENT CONSULTANTS IN CARDIOVASCULAR DISEASES, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRISTATE REGIONAL ASSOCIATES LLP
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASSOCIATED CLINICAL LABORATORIES, LP
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST PENN ALLEGHENY HEALTH SYSTEM, INC. doing business as ALLEGHENY GENERAL HOSPITAL doing business as WEST PENN HOSPITAL doing business as FORBES HOSPITAL
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY CLINICAL MEDICAL ONCOLOGY
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WEST PENN ALLEGHENY FOUNDATION, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCCANDLESS ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORTH SHORE ENDOSCOPY CENTER LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY CLINIC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLE-KISKI MEDICAL CENTER
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PREMIER MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, PC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PREMIER WOMENS HEALTH
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANONSBURG GENERAL HOSPITAL AMBULANCE SERVICES
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WATERFRONT SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFERSON MEDICAL ASSOCIATES, LP
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH HILLS SURGERY CENTER, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT VINCENT HEALTH CENTER
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGIONAL HEART NETWORK
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT VINCENT HEALTH SYSTEM
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLEGHENY HEALTH NETWORK HOME INFUSION, LLC
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAINT VINCENT MEDICAL EDUCATION & RESEARCH INSTITUTE, INC.
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESTFIELD MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, INC.
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAUTAUQUA MEDICAL PRACTICE P.C.
Represented By: Douglas E. Cameron
Represented By: Matthew Louik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN GUARANTEE AND LIABILITY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Louis A. Bove
Represented By: Jared Clapper
Represented By: Patrick F. Hofer
Represented By: Timothy A. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?