MACLLOYD v. TRATE
Petitioner: DAVID ERIKE MACLLOYD
Respondent: BRADLEY TRATE
Case Number: 2:2021cv01326
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Maureen P Kelly
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 Remark: Correspondence received from DAVID ERIKE MACLLOYD. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that, on or before 12/23/2021, Petitioner shall complete the attached form, in which he shall clarify whether he, through the present Petition, intends to seek relief from the execution of his sentence pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, or is attacking the validity of the sentence imposed by the Eastern District of Michigan pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2255. As more fully stated in the Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Clarification Form) (dad)
November 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Sanctions by DAVID ERIKE MACLLOYD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Envelope) (lar)
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-04109. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER FORTHWITH THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE WESTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AND CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE BERLE M. SCHILLER ON 10/4/2021. 10/5/2021 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE.(sg, )
September 23, 2021 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number APE5580 FCI MCKEAN (dt, )
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 EXHIBIT by DAVID ERIKE MACLLOYD.(er, )
September 17, 2021 COPY OF PRO SE GUIDELINES HAVE BEEN MAILED TO PRO SE, MACLLOYD. (bw, )
September 13, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) (Main Document 2 replaced on 9/17/2021) (bw, ).
September 13, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DAVID ERIKE MACLLOYD. (NO FEE PAID; NO IFP FILED)(bw, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACLLOYD v. TRATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DAVID ERIKE MACLLOYD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: BRADLEY TRATE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?