HAWKEY v. CHEW et al
Plaintiff: HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR.
Defendant: DOUGLAS CHEW, GINA CERILLI, SEAN KERTES, JOHN WALTON, BRYAN KLINE and LEISHA REHARD
Case Number: 2:2021cv01339
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Dodge
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE advising Plaintiff that the Court received the Prisoner Trust Account Statement on November 8, 2021 [ECF No 8]. Plaintiff is further advised that this civil action remains CLOSED until all deficiencies as outlined in the Courts October 25, 2021 Deficiency Order [ECF No 5] are cured. Plaintiff shall provide the Court with the required service copies, as more fully stated in the Deficiency Order [ECF No 5], on or before January 3, 2022. (mqe)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sdp)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DEFICIENCY ORDER. This case is dismissed as a result of the filing deficiencies by Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall mark this case CLOSED. The Plaintiff may reopen this case by satisfying the filing deficiencies as more fully stated in said order on or before 11/26/2021 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Dodge on 10/25/2021. (mqe)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (jd)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (jd)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAWKEY v. CHEW et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HUGH JAMES HAWKEY, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS CHEW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GINA CERILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN KERTES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN WALTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN KLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEISHA REHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?