DANSKY v. KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS, N.V. et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DANSKY
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01458
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER #4. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the deadline for the parties to file a proposed interim preservation order, originally established in Pretrial Order No. 2, is hereby extended until Thursday, December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2021. (sms)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRETRIAL ORDER #3. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the Initial Status Conference will take place on 12/15/2021 at 02:00 PM; the dial-in number for the initial status conference, which shall be used by any individual who wants to listen to the initial status conference, but not participate in the conference, is 888-363-4749, and the access code is 1490596; the court will email the information for participation in the initial status conference via videoconferencing to any attorney of record who files a motion for alternative method to appear and whose motion is granted by the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/1/2021. (sms)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Motions to appear by an alternative method and Notices of any plaintiff appearing through a designated attorney instead of the plaintiff's attorney of record are due by 12/8/2021 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
October 21, 2021 Filing 11 Case transferred in from District of New Jersey; Case Number 1:21-cv-16582. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order of MDL Panel CTO-1 transferring case to the District of Pennsylvania Western. (dd, )
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Stay; the instant action is stayed pending a decision by the JPML on the motion to consolidate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 10/20/2021. (tf, )
October 7, 2021 Reset Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
October 4, 2021 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer. Motion set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Robert B. Kugler. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, )
October 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on a Motion to Transfer by PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Stay, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(LAVELLE, JOHN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA, LLC identifying KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NAAMLOZE VENOOTSCHAP as Corporate Parent.. (LAVELLE, JOHN)
October 4, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN P. LAVELLE, JR on behalf of PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA, LLC (LAVELLE, JOHN)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Philips RS North America LLC on September 13, 2021, filed by MICHAEL DANSKY. (MESSA, JOSEPH)
September 29, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Koninklijke Philips N.V. on September 13, 2021, filed by MICHAEL DANSKY. (MESSA, JOSEPH)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons and complaint served on Philips North America LLC on September 13, 2021, filed by MICHAEL DANSKY. (MESSA, JOSEPH)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS, N.V., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (alb, )
September 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS, N.V., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA, LLC, PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12781085) with JURY DEMAND, filed by MICHAEL DANSKY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MESSA, JOSEPH)
September 8, 2021 Judge Robert B. Kugler and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dd, )
September 8, 2021 CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The COMPLAINT #1 submitted by JOSEPH MESSA on 9/8/2021 appears to have address information that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (alb, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DANSKY v. KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS, N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DANSKY
Represented By: Joseph L Messa, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: John P. Lavelle, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Represented By: John P. Lavelle, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?