COLUMBUS v. KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD COLUMBUS, JR.
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01491
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 1:21-cv-11560. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2021 Filing 6 Case Electronically transferred to Western District of Pennyslvania pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 10/20/2021 Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11132-DJC et al.(Currie, Haley)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 Certified copy of MDL Initial Transfer Order in MDL Case 3014 received from Western District of Pennsylvania requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11132-DJC et al.(Currie, Haley)
October 20, 2021 Filing 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 1 in MDL Case 3014 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-11130-DJC et al.(Jones, Sherry)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Koninklijke Philips N.V. Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-8966072 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by EDWARD COLUMBUS, JR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form)(Pawa, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COLUMBUS v. KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD COLUMBUS, JR.
Represented By: Matthew F. Pawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?