Quivandra Lawson v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Plaintiff: Quivandra Lawson
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01501
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:21-cv-07673. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2021 Filing 17 Conditional Transfer Order - 1 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3014, transferring case to USDC, Western District of Pennsylvania and assigned to Honorable Joy Flowers Conti. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (gk)
October 13, 2021 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson, upon Defendant Philips RS North America LLC served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, authorized agent for CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arevalo, Kristy)
October 13, 2021 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson, upon Defendant Philips North America LLC served on 10/5/2021, answer due 10/26/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Nicole Stauss, authorized agent for CSC Lawyers Incorporating Service, agent for service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Philips RS North America LLC. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Philips North America LLC. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Koninklijke Philips N.V. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
September 28, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (ghap)
September 27, 2021 Filing 7 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson. (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson. (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson. (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 27, 2021 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson. (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 27, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson, (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson. (Arevalo, Kristy)
September 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32051883 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Quivandra Lawson. (Attorney Kristy M Arevalo added to party Quivandra Lawson(pty:pla))(Arevalo, Kristy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quivandra Lawson v. Koninklijke Philips N.V. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quivandra Lawson
Represented By: Kristy M Arevalo
Represented By: Catherine M Roe
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N.V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?