Polidore v. Koninklijke Philips N V et al
Plaintiff: Lionel Polidore, Jr
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N V, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA and PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01527
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:21-cv-03438. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR MULTI-DISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER CTO # 1, directing transfer to Western District of Pennsylvania, In Re: Philips Recalled CPAP, Bi-Level PAP, and Mechanical Ventilator Products Liability Litigation, MDL # 3014. Record electronically transmitted to receiving court. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Reeves, T)
October 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE received via email from Clerk of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transmitting Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1) in MDL No.3014, IN RE: Philips Recalled CPAP, Bi-Level PAP, and Mechanical Ventilator Products Liability Litigation advising case shall be transferred to the Western District of Pennsylvania upon request of the record. (crt,Reeves, T)
September 27, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Koninklijke Philips N V, Philips North America L L C, Philips R S North America L L C. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 25, 2021 CASE Assigned to Judge Michael J Juneau and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Miletello, A)
September 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Koninklijke Philps N V, Philips North America L L C, Philips R S North America L L C with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4832950) filed by Lionel Polidore, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Richard Lee Root added to party Lionel Polidore, Jr(pty:pla))(aty,Root, Richard) Modified docket text on 9/27/2021 (Miletello, A).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Polidore v. Koninklijke Philips N V et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lionel Polidore, Jr
Represented By: Richard Lee Root
Represented By: Betsy J. Barnes
Represented By: Paul Hankins Villalobos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS N V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?