WALSH v. RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, et al
Plaintiff: MARTIN J. WALSH, SECRETARY OF LABOR and UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Defendant: RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, doing business as RELIABLE HOME HEALTH and ALI MOHAMED
Case Number: 2:2021cv01565
Filed: November 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cathy Bissoon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by MARTIN J. WALSH. ALI MOHAMED waiver sent on 11/23/2021, answer due 1/24/2022; RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, waiver sent on 11/23/2021, answer due 1/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Summons) (Ferguson, Edwin)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Jian Hang to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/20/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm)
November 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Ge Qu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/20/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ahm)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 Proposed Order re #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED,. (Hang, Jian)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Jian Hang to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6815968) by ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED,. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jian Hang's Affidavit in Support of Motion, #2 Jian Hang's certificate of good standing) (Hang, Jian)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 Proposed Order re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED,. (Qu, Ge)
November 19, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for attorney Ge Qu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, on behalf of defendants (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6815376) filed by ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Qu, Ge)
November 19, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION for attorney Ge Qu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, on behalf of defendants (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6815376) filed by ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED,. (Qu, Ge)
November 19, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Ge Qu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, on behalf of defendants (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6815376) by ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED,. (Qu, Ge)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss, more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/4/21. (jhi)
November 4, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, (Attachments: #1 Summons Reliable Home Health) (elt)
November 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR, ALI MOHAMED, RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, ), filed by MARTIN J. WALSH, SECRETARY OF LABOR, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (elt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALSH v. RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN J. WALSH
Represented By: Edwin Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SECRETARY OF LABOR
Represented By: Edwin Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF LABOR
Represented By: Edwin Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RELIABLE HOME HEALTH, LIMTED, doing business as RELIABLE HOME HEALTH
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALI MOHAMED
Represented By: Ge Qu
Represented By: Jian Hang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?