MORTON v. FRANCIS et al
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MORTON
Defendant: KURT DARREN FRANCIS, KOLADZYN WILLIAM OTTO, FERNANDO FRANCIS and CHARL FRANCIS
Case Number: 2:2021cv01576
Filed: November 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/18/2022. (bjl)
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CYNTHIA MORTON (Newman, Darth) Modified text on 2/22/2022. (lar)
December 13, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Smith on behalf of FERNANDO FRANCIS, KURT DARREN FRANCIS. (Smith, Timothy)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 RICO Case Statement by CYNTHIA MORTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1825 Bayshore Blvd Record, #2 Exhibit 177 Cyprus Ave Record) (Newman, Darth)
November 3, 2021 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available #Here. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/3/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF docum ent will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CHARL FRANCIS, FERNANDO FRANCIS, KURT DARREN FRANCIS (Attachments: #1 Summons Fernando Francis, #2 Summons Charl Francis) (lar)
November 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CHARL FRANCIS, FERNANDO FRANCIS, KURT DARREN FRANCIS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6786713), filed by CYNTHIA MORTON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet) (lar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORTON v. FRANCIS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KURT DARREN FRANCIS
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KOLADZYN WILLIAM OTTO
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FERNANDO FRANCIS
Represented By: Timothy R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHARL FRANCIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CYNTHIA MORTON
Represented By: Darth M. Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?