WALSH v. OM SHIVA ENTERPRISE, INC. et al
Plaintiff: MARTIN J. WALSH
Defendant: OM SHIVA ENTERPRISE, INC. doing business as MONACA SUNOCO, DURLABHJU UKANI and BHARTIBEN UKANI
Case Number: 2:2021cv01578
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of MARTIN J. WALSH against OM SHIVA ENTERPRISE, INC., BHARTIBEN UKANI, and DURLABHJU UKANI in the amount of $281,029. The Court approves the Consent Judgment. The clerk is to mark the case closed. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/5/2021. (dmm)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment by MARTIN J. WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Consent Judgment) (Dennis, Ethan)
November 4, 2021 Filing 3 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/4/2021. (dmm)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/4/2021. (dmm)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OM SHIVA ENTERPRISE, INC., BHARTIBEN UKANI, DURLABHJU UKANI, filed by MARTIN J. WALSH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Schedule A) (cww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WALSH v. OM SHIVA ENTERPRISE, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN J. WALSH
Represented By: Bertha M. Astorga
Represented By: Ethan Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OM SHIVA ENTERPRISE, INC. doing business as MONACA SUNOCO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DURLABHJU UKANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BHARTIBEN UKANI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?