Walker et al v. Philips R S North America, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Philip Eugene Walker and LINDA WALKER
Defendant: Philips R S North America, LLC, RESPIRONICS INC. and Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech Healthcare, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01588
Filed: November 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-04316. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-2 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Case to be transferred to Western District of Pennsylvania for inclusion in MDL No. 3014. (ceo)
November 4, 2021 Civil Case Terminated. (ceo)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Stay Pending JPML Decision. It is therefore ORDERED that all proceedings in this action are stayed. Signed by Judge Eleanor L. Ross on 10/22/2021. (ayw)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 First MOTION to Stay Pending JPML Decision with Brief In Support by Philips R S North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A for Proposed Order on Motion to Stay, #2 Brief Memo ISO Motion to Stay Pending JPML Decision, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A for Memo ISO Motion to Stay Pending JPML Decision - Notice of Related Action, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B for Memo ISO Motion to Stay Pending JPML Decision - Transfer Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C for Memo ISO Motion to Stay Pending JPML Decision - Stay Orders (Updated 10.12.21))(Mazziotti, Thomas)
October 15, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE FROM THE COURT: INSTRUCTIONS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE ELEANOR L. ROSS. (mlb)
October 15, 2021 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech Healthcare, Inc., Philips R S North America, LLC, Respironics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Capital Research and Management Company, Other Affiliate Silver Point Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate Venor Capital Management L.P. for Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech Healthcare, Inc.; Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap, Other Affiliate Philips Holding USA Inc. for Philips R S North America, LLC. (vs)
October 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BGANDC-11329630) filed by Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech, Respironics, Inc., Philiops R S North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Supplemental notice of appearance, #13 Civil Cover Sheet)(vs) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified on 10/15/2021 to correct filer(vs).
October 15, 2021 Clerks Notation re #2 Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech Healthcare, Inc., Philips R S North America, LLC, Respironics, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Capital Research and Management Company, Other Affiliate Silver Point Finance, LLC, Other Affiliate Venor Capital Management L.P. for Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech Healthcare, Inc.; Corporate Parent Koninklijke Philips Naamloze Venootschap, and Other Affiliate Philips Holding USA Inc. for Philips R S North America, LLC. Read and approved by District Judge Eleanor L. Ross. (mlb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. Philips R S North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Eugene Walker
Represented By: Harry B. White
Represented By: William Anthony Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA WALKER
Represented By: Harry B. White
Represented By: William Anthony Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philips R S North America, LLC
Represented By: John P. Lavelle, JR.
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RESPIRONICS INC.
Represented By: John P. Lavelle, JR.
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Extended Medical Division of Rotech Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: John P. Lavelle, JR.
Represented By: Thomas J. Mazziotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?