HILL v. KERTES et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL
Defendant: SEAN KERTES, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ and WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01613
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 19 US Marshal's Return of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, along with this Order, to the Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs were advanced by the United States of Americaas to Eric Schwartz, Westmoreland County Prison, Wexford Health Sources Inc. and Sean Kertes executed on 1/22/2021. (jv)
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by SEAN KERTES, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Avolio on behalf of SEAN KERTES, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC B. SCHWARTZ. ERIC B. SCHWARTZ waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON. WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SEAN KERTES. SEAN KERTES waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Avolio, Scott)
December 10, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. (Watson, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying The Bantry Group Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. (Watson, Christopher)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Wetzel on behalf of WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.. (Wetzel, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC. waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Watson, Christopher)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Watson on behalf of WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.. (Watson, Christopher)
December 6, 2021 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #9 Notice of Appearance, #10 Waiver of Service Executed, #11 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 12/13/2021. (jv)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, along with this Order, to the Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/15/2021. (cmc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL. (jv)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against SEAN KERTES, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC., filed by WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jv)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/10/2021. (cmc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/9/2021. (cmc)
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL. (jv)
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL. (Attachments: #1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #2 Authorization by Prisoner, #3 Exhibit, #4 Envelope) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. KERTES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM JOSEPH HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEAN KERTES
Represented By: Scott Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON
Represented By: Scott Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Scott Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES, INC.
Represented By: Christopher J. Watson
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?