HILL v. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC. et al
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J. HILL
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC., WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON, GEORGE LOWTHER and ERIC B. SCHWARTZ
Case Number: 2:2021cv01619
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2021 Filing 20 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by GEORGE LOWTHER, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Avolio on behalf of GEORGE LOWTHER, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GEORGE LOWTHER. GEORGE LOWTHER waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ERIC B. SCHWARTZ. ERIC B. SCHWARTZ waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Avolio, Scott)
December 21, 2021 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON. WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Avolio, Scott)
December 15, 2021 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying without prejudice #14 Motion to Appoint Counsel by WILLIAM J. HILL. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 12/15/2021. (cmc)
December 14, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by WILLIAM J. HILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
December 10, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC.. (Watson, Christopher)
December 8, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying The Bantry Group Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC.. (Watson, Christopher)
December 6, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey J. Wetzel on behalf of WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC.. (Wetzel, Jeffrey)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC.. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC. waiver sent on 11/22/2021, answer due 1/21/2022. (Watson, Christopher)
December 6, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J. Watson on behalf of WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC.. (Watson, Christopher)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the Complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, and waiver, along with this Order, to the Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff, costs to be advanced by the United States of America. The Defendants are requested to waive service pursuant to Rule 4(d). Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/15/2021. (cmc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 7 Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by WILLIAM J. HILL. (jd)
November 10, 2021 Filing 6 COMPLAINT against GEORGE LOWTHER, ERIC B. SCHWARTZ, WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON, WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC. ), filed by WILLIAM J. HILL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jd) Updated filed date to correspond with date of Order granting IFP. Modified text on 11/10/2021. (cmc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/10/2021. (cmc)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE CIVIL RIGHTS CASES. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 11/10/2021. (cmc)
November 9, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by WILLIAM J. HILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by WILLIAM J. HILL. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (sms)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by WILLIAM J. HILL. (Attachments: #1 Authorization Form, #2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Envelope) (sms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J. HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WEXFORD HEALTH SOURCES INC.
Represented By: Christopher J. Watson
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WESTMORELAND COUNTY PRISON
Represented By: Scott Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEORGE LOWTHER
Represented By: Scott Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC B. SCHWARTZ
Represented By: Scott Avolio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?