HAZLETT v. J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JACOB HAZLETT
Defendant: J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC doing business as MISTER SEWER and JASON DAUGHERTY
Case Number: 2:2021cv01638
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Mark R Hornak
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by JASON DAUGHERTY, J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Loeffler, Catherine)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Catherine S. Loeffler on behalf of JASON DAUGHERTY, J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC. (Loeffler, Catherine)
December 16, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JACOB HAZLETT. Answer due January 3, 2022 from All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Ward, Joshua)
November 17, 2021 Filing 6 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice and use either Dial-In No. 1 or Dial-In No. 2, both of which are contained in this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only", so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jad)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/17/21. (jad)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jad)
November 16, 2021 Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak presiding. (lyk)
November 16, 2021 Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer presiding. (lyk)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 Errata re #1 Complaint. Reason for Correction: Case number missing from document. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cww)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to JASON DAUGHERTY, J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC (cww)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JASON DAUGHERTY, J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6801136), filed by JACOB HAZLETT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cww) Refiled at #3 . Documents hidden from public view. Modified text on 11/12/2021. (cww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HAZLETT v. J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACOB HAZLETT
Represented By: Joshua P. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. DAUGHTERY INDUSTRIES, LLC doing business as MISTER SEWER
Represented By: Catherine S. Loeffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASON DAUGHERTY
Represented By: Catherine S. Loeffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?