Jackson v. Koninklijke Phillips NV et al
Plaintiff: Latonya Jackson
Defendant: Koninklijke Phillips NV, PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC and PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2021cv01737
Filed: November 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:21-cv-02817. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 29, 2021 Filing 5 Conditional Transfer Order: The JPML has issued the attached order in MDL 3014, and that order has now been filed in the Western District of Pennsylvania. (ndt)
November 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Koninklijke Phillips NV, Philips Holding USA Inc, Philips North America LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (axm)
November 12, 2021 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Latonya Jackson. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons) (Spurling, Dennis)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Latonya Jackson. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number 0539-12380101) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) Recall Notice, #3 Exhibit(s) MDL ORDER) (Spurling, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Koninklijke Phillips NV et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonya Jackson
Represented By: Dennis Damonn Spurling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koninklijke Phillips NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?