PATEL v. VIATRIS, INC. et al
Plaintiff: RAJESH PATEL
Defendant: VIATRIS, INC., PFIZER INC., MICHAEL GOETTLER, SANJEEV NARULA, BRYAN SUPRAN, MARGARET M. MADDEN, DOUGLAS E. GIORDANO, ROBERT J. COURY, IAN READ and JAMES KILTS
Case Number: 2:2021cv01769
Filed: December 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF in Opposition re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by VIATRIS, INC.. (Soller, Eric)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G. Soller on behalf of ROBERT J. COURY, MICHAEL GOETTLER, JAMES KILTS, SANJEEV NARULA, IAN READ, VIATRIS, INC.. (Soller, Eric)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court. Response to Motion due by 1/31/2022. Brief shall not exceed 25 pages. Reply due by 2/14/2022. Brief shall not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 1/3/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av)
December 31, 2021 Filing 4 BRIEF in Support re #3 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by RAJESH PATEL. (Iverson, Kelly)
December 31, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by RAJESH PATEL. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Iverson, Kelly)
December 3, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by VIATRIS, INC. (ijh)
December 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allegheny County, case number GD-21-13314 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6835762), filed by VIATRIS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ijh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PATEL v. VIATRIS, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAJESH PATEL
Represented By: Armen Zohbrabian
Represented By: Brian J. Schall
Represented By: David W. Hall
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Jonathan M. Zimmerman
Represented By: Thomas L. Laughlin
Represented By: Kelly K. Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIATRIS, INC.
Represented By: William Pietragallo, II
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PFIZER INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL GOETTLER
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANJEEV NARULA
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRYAN SUPRAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARGARET M. MADDEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS E. GIORDANO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT J. COURY
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAN READ
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES KILTS
Represented By: Eric G. Soller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?