Parker et al v. Philips RS North America LLC et al
Plaintiff: David D Parker and Jill M Parker
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC and PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC
Case Number: 2:2021cv01901
Filed: December 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PRETRIAL ORDER #9. ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE for 3/22/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/23/2022. (sms)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PRETRIAL ORDER #8: ORDER APPOINTING CO-LEAD COUNSEL, PLAINTIFFS' STEERING COMMITTEE, CO-LIAISON COUNSEL, AND CERTAIN COMMITTEE AND SUBCOMMITTEE CHAIRS AND MEMBERS. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/15/2022. (sms)
February 8, 2022 Filing 25 TOLLING AGREEMENT. (sms)
February 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PRETRIAL ORDER #7. ORDER MAKING TOLLING AGREEMENT AVAILABLE ON COURT'S WEBSITE. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 2/8/2022. (sms)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 INTERIM PRESERVATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 1/11/2022. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER #6. As more fully set forth in the attached order, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following individuals are appointed as interim lead counsel to serve with the six individuals named as interim lead counsel in Pretrial Order #2: Dennis Damonn Spurling and Shanon J. Carson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the appointment of the foregoing counsel as interim lead counsel is made in accordance with Pretrial Order #2, including the duties and responsibilities of the interim lead counsel set forth in Pretrial Order #2. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/21/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PRETRIAL ORDER #5: The schedule for the court's selection of the Plaintiffs' Steering Committee, lead counsel, and liaison counsel is as follows: (1) Applications Due - 1/4/2022; (2) Objections Due - 1/11/2022; and (3) Responses to Objections Due - 1/18/2022. Interviews will take place on January 27, 2022, at 2:00 p.m., and, if necessary, January 28, 2022, at 2:00 p.m. in person at the courthouse in Judge Conti's courtroom. The applications, objections, and responses must comply with paragraph 14 of Pretrial Order #1. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/20/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PRETRIAL ORDER #4. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the deadline for the parties to file a proposed interim preservation order, originally established in Pretrial Order No. 2, is hereby extended until Thursday, December 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/14/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d). Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/10/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRETRIAL ORDER #3. As more fully set forth in the attached order: the Initial Status Conference will take place on 12/15/2021 at 02:00 PM; the dial-in number for the initial status conference, which shall be used by any individual who wants to listen to the initial status conference, but not participate in the conference, is 888-363-4749, and the access code is 1490596; the court will email the information for participation in the initial status conference via videoconferencing to any attorney of record who files a motion for alternative method to appear and whose motion is granted by the court. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 12/1/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PRETRIAL ORDER #2 with Respect to (1) Interim Modifications to the Preservation Requirements and (2) Appointment of Interim Lead Plaintiffs' Counsel for the Purpose of Negotiating an Interim Proposed Preservation Order, as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/19/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER #1. Initial Status Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Joy Flowers Conti. Motions to appear by an alternative method and Notices of any plaintiff appearing through a designated attorney instead of the plaintiff's attorney of record are due by 12/8/2021 as more fully set forth in the attached Order. Signed by Judge Joy Flowers Conti on 11/10/2021. (sms)
December 29, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-10274. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 29, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/28/2021) (sjo)
December 29, 2021 MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - Western District of Pennsylvania. (sjo)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter, filed by Jill M Parker, David D Parker. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for March 10, 2022 and the related deadlines are hereby adjourned. Plaintiff is ordered to file a letter by March 1, 2022 updating the Court on the status of the case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/17/2021) (tg)
December 17, 2021 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul)
December 16, 2021 Filing 10 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Paul D. Rheingold dated 12/16/2021 re: To adjourne initial activities in the SDNY for a reasonable time in order to affect the transfer to the MDL.. Document filed by David D Parker, Jill M Parker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Rheingold, Paul)
December 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/10/2022 at 4:45 PM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. This conference will be held via telephone. The parties shall use the following dial-in information to call in to the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 12/13/2021) (vfr)
December 3, 2021 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips RS North America LLC..(jgo)
December 3, 2021 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips North America LLC..(jgo)
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Philips Holding USA, Inc...(jgo)
December 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the County code has been modified to Ulster; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
December 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code was not selected on the PDF;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
December 3, 2021 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Paul D. Rheingold. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC; PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
December 3, 2021 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (jgo)
December 3, 2021 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(jgo)
December 3, 2021 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
December 2, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David D Parker, Jill M Parker..(Rheingold, Paul)
December 2, 2021 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David D Parker, Jill M Parker..(Rheingold, Paul)
December 2, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PHILIPS RS NORTH AMERICA LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David D Parker, Jill M Parker..(Rheingold, Paul)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rheingold, Paul) Modified on 12/3/2021 (jgo).
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PHILIPS HOLDING USA, INC., PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC, Philips RS North America LLC. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25414224)Document filed by David D Parker, Jill M Parker..(Rheingold, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker et al v. Philips RS North America LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D Parker
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jill M Parker
Represented By: Paul D. Rheingold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS R.S. NORTH AMERICA, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHILIPS HOLDING USA INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?