WHITAKER v. SCI-FAYETTE et al
Plaintiff: DAMION D. WHITAKER
Defendant: SCI-FAYETTE, ERIC ARMEL, RHONDA HOUSE, MR. HAWKINBERRY, E. WALKER, MR. ASTON, MRS. HAWKINBERRY, D. BURNSHORTS, DEBRA BURNSWORTH, DOBISH, MR. WENTZEL, B. BUDZIEHSK, LT. MATIYASIC, COLE DISALVO, LISA DUNCAN, J. DONGILLI, C.O. MR. ROGERS, MAJ. ROBERT HAWKINBERRY, LT. J. ASTON, DEBRA HAWKINBERRY, D. BURNSWORTH, WENTZEL, LT. K. MATIYASIC, LT. J. DONGILLI, ROGERS, D. VARNER, LOIS ALLEN, JOSEPH TREMPUS, CPT. CARL E. WALKER, MR. COOK, S. RIDDLE, JEFFERY SCHAUP, LT. C. DISALVO, J. BIGAM and PRITCHETT
Case Number: 2:2022cv00038
Filed: January 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: W Scott Hardy
Referring Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LOIS ALLEN, ERIC ARMEL, J. ASTON, J. BIGAM, B. BUDZIEHSK, D. BURNSHORTS, D. BURNSWORTH, COOK, C. DISALVO, COLE DISALVO, DOBISH, J. DONGILLI, LISA DUNCAN, DEBRA HAWKINBERRY, ROBERT HAWKINBERRY, RHONDA HOUSE, K. MATIYASIC, PRITCHETT, S. RIDDLE, ROGERS, JEFFERY SCHAUP, SCI-FAYETTE, JOSEPH TREMPUS, D. VARNER, CARL E. WALKER, E. WALKER, WENTZEL, filed by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (pak)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to reopen this case and to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 03/04/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Authorization Form) (jmb)
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (pak)
February 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying as moot #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File an account statement. In this Court's Order of 1/27/2022, affirmed by the District Judge on 2/11/2022 (ECF No. 14), the Court denied Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In forma Pauperis for failure to submit a copy of a trust fund account statement. The Court further ordered that this case be closed, and that if Plaintiff submitted another motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint, and the Court granted the motion, the case would be reopened. There is no deadline for the filing of this account statement so no extension is necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 2/14/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (Lenihan, Lisa)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER indicating that, upon consideration of #11 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court, and for the reasons set forth in Judge Lenihan's Order at Docket No. #7 , said order shall be affirmed. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 2/11/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 LETTER from Clerk re #11 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court to pay appeal filing fee or submit a motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. (pak)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by DAMION D. WHITAKER re #7 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (pak)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge W. Scott Hardy presiding and Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan added as referral. (jv)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan no longer presiding in case. (jv)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Trust Fund Account Information, by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (pak)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Amended CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (pak)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Remark: Amended Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (pak)
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (ECF. No. #5 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may submit another motion to proceed in forma pauperis, along with a certified copy of the inmate account statement for the six (6) months preceding the filing of the complaint. If that resubmitted motion is granted, the case will be reopened. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff may reopen the case by paying the $402.00 filing fee. AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.C.2. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days may constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/27/2022. (jmb)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Authorization, #2 Envelope) (cww)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Remark: Request for Service without Prepayment of Marshal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 01/25/2022. (jmb)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION to Subpoena Records by DAMION D. WHITAKER. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Remark: Complaint lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (cww)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan presiding. Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly no longer assigned to case. Initial assignment at case opening made in error. (cww)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITAKER v. SCI-FAYETTE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAMION D. WHITAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI-FAYETTE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ERIC ARMEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RHONDA HOUSE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. HAWKINBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. ASTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MRS. HAWKINBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. BURNSHORTS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA BURNSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOBISH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. WENTZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. BUDZIEHSK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. MATIYASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COLE DISALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA DUNCAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. DONGILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.O. MR. ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAJ. ROBERT HAWKINBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. J. ASTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEBRA HAWKINBERRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. BURNSWORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WENTZEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. K. MATIYASIC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. J. DONGILLI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROGERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. VARNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOIS ALLEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH TREMPUS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CPT. CARL E. WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MR. COOK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. RIDDLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFERY SCHAUP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LT. C. DISALVO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. BIGAM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PRITCHETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?