UPMC MCKEESPORT v. SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al
Plaintiff: UPMC MCKEESPORT
Defendant: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND and SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00178
Filed: February 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joy Flowers Conti
Referring Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Employee Pension Plan
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Bruce Ludwig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/31/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER, by stipulation and agreement of the parties, Defendants have until April 5, 2022 to file their Answer. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/31/2022. (dmm)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for attorney Bruce M. Ludwig to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7029244) by SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC. (Ludwig, Bruce)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND Answer due from SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND on 4/5/2022. (Alexander, Robert)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Healey on behalf of SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Healey, Michael)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for April Pullium to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/29/2022. (dmm)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Robert Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/29/2022. (dmm)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for attorney April Pullium to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7026109) by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Pullium, April)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Robert Alexander to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7026054) by SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Alexander, Robert)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #10 Errata, #9 Local Rule 7.1 Certificate. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Disclosure Statement. This message is for informational purposes only. (pak)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Disclosure Statement identifying SUSQUEHANNA HEALTH SYSTEM INNOVATION CENTER; SOMERSET HOSPITAL; SOMERSET MANAGEMENT SERVICES; LAUREL HEALTH SYSTEM; PINNACLE HEALTH SYSTEM; and HANOVER HOSPITAL as subsidiaries or other affiliate, by UPMC MCKEESPORT. (pak)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Errata re #9 Local Rule 7.1 Certificate Corporate Disclosure Statement by UPMC MCKEESPORT. Reason for Correction: Document filed under incorrect event. (Ennis, Peter) Refiled with correct event at #11 Modified text on 3/3/2022. (pak)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 LOCAL RULE 7.1 CERTIFICATE by UPMC MCKEESPORT . (Ennis, Peter) Refiled with correct event at #11 . Modified text on 3/3/2022. (pak)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Allen Hancock on behalf of SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC. (Hancock, Ryan)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica C. Caggiano on behalf of SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC. (Caggiano, Jessica)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UPMC MCKEESPORT. SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC waiver sent on 2/4/2022, answer due 4/5/2022. (Ennis, Peter)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by UPMC MCKEESPORT. SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND waiver sent on 2/1/2022, answer due 4/4/2022. (Ennis, Peter)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/4/2022. (dmm)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/4/2022. (dmm)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Joy Flowers Conti no longer assigned to case. (pak)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Marilyn J. Horan added. (pak)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND (pak)
February 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC, SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6927785) filed by UPMC MCKEESPORT. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6) (pak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UPMC MCKEESPORT v. SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UPMC MCKEESPORT
Represented By: Peter J. Ennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SERVICE EMPLOYEES INTERNATIONAL UNION NATIONAL INDUSTRY PENSION FUND
Represented By: Robert W. Alexander
Represented By: April Pullium
Represented By: Michael J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU HEALTHCARE PENNSYLVANIA CTW, CLC
Represented By: Bruce Michael Ludwig
Represented By: Ryan Allen Hancock
Represented By: Jessica C. Caggiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?