DOE v. UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION, PETER P. BUTTIGIEG, BLANE A. WORKIE, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION, ROCHELLE WALENSKY, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES and XAVIER BECERRA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00402
Filed: March 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Reed Eddy
Referring Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 702 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER re #21 Motion to Expedite filed by JOHN DOE. Defendants shall file a response to this motion by 5/11/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/27/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mrm)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by XAVIER BECERRA, PETER P. BUTTIGIEG, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION, ROCHELLE WALENSKY, BLANE A. WORKIE. (Wilk, Ryan)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge William S. Stickman presiding and Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy referred. (sms)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym with Incorporated Memorandum in Support by JOHN DOE. Defendants shall file a Response to Plaintiff's Motion on or before 5/4/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/22/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOHN DOE. (Doe, John)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with the case management system in place in this district, this case has been assigned to the undersigned for all pretrial matters. Therefore, it is ORDERED that on or before 4/28/2022, the parties shall complete an election form either consenting to jurisdiction by the Magistrate Judge or electing to have a District Judge assigned to the case, and shall file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of the form can be found on this Court's website at: http://www.pawd.uscourts.gov/sites/pawd/files/Consent-to-Mag.pdf. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 4/21/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Expedite Responses to and consideration of the motion for preliminary injunction by JOHN DOE. (Doe, John)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Wilk on behalf of XAVIER BECERRA, PETER P. BUTTIGIEG, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION, ROCHELLE WALENSKY, BLANE A. WORKIE. (Wilk, Ryan)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from All Defendants 5/23/2022, per Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (a)(2),(3). (cmc)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES served on 4/4/2022, answer due 4/25/2022. (Doe, John)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. All Defendants. (Doe, John)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. All Defendants. (Doe, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. BLANE A. WORKIE served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Doe, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. ROCHELLE WALENSKY served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Doe, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Doe, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Doe, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. PETER P. BUTTIGIEG served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Doe, John)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by JOHN DOE. XAVIER BECERRA served on 3/24/2022, answer due 4/14/2022. (Doe, John)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (sdp)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOHN DOE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a decision on this Motion in abeyance, to allow Defendants an opportunity to respond once service has been effectuated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/17/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (mrm)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Doe, John)
March 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JOHN DOE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Doe, John)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons Issued as to XAVIER BECERRA, PETER P. BUTTIGIEG, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION, ROCHELLE WALENSKY, BLANE A. WORKIE (sdp)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re: #2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym with Incorporated Memorandum in Support by JOHN DOE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will hold a decision on this Motion in abeyance, to allow Defendants an opportunity to respond once service has been effectuated. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/14/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cmc)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by JOHN DOE (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons for Xavier Becerra, #2 Summons Summons for Peter P. Buttigieg, #3 Summons Summons for Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, #4 Summons Summons for United States Department of Transportation, #5 Summons Summons for United States Department of Health and Human Services, #6 Summons Summons for Rochelle P. Walensky, #7 Summons Summons for Blane A. Workie) (Doe, John)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER FOR PRO SE LITIGANTS. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 3/8/2022. (cmc)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Under Pseudonym with Incorporated Memorandum in Support by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (dmh)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against XAVIER BECERRA, PETER P. BUTTIGIEG, CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION, ROCHELLE WALENSKY, BLANE A. WORKIE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-6984845), filed by JOHN DOE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (dmh)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order w\ #2 BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Proceed Under Pseudonym with Incorporated Memorandum in Support filed by JOHN DOE. (dmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DOE v. UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPT. OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PETER P. BUTTIGIEG
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BLANE A. WORKIE
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CENTERS FOR DISEASE CONTROL & PREVENTION
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCHELLE WALENSKY
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES DEPT. OF HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XAVIER BECERRA
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?