WILLIAMS v. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Petitioner: JOSHUA WILLIAMS
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA, PENNSYLVANIA and DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Case Number: 2:2022cv00569
Filed: April 18, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Lisa Pupo Lenihan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #10 Answer to Writ, filed by JOSHUA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Z, #2 Exhibit Z3, #3 Envelope) (jd)
June 16, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JOSHUA WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)
May 25, 2022 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORDS received from Court of Common Pleas of ALLEGHENY County and forwarded to Mag. Judge Lenihan. Case Number(s): 2009-6775, 2009-11756, 2009-13294, 2009-13882, 2009-17835. Transcript Number(s): T19-0239. (jd)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that because this case has been assigned to a Magistrate Judge, each party must execute and file the form consenting to the jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge or selecting the option to have the case randomly assigned to a District Judge no later than June 15, 2022. The applicable form is available on the Courts website at www.pawd.uscourts.gov in the forms section and attached as an exhibit to this order. THE EVENT USED FOR DOCKETING THIS FORM IS FOUND UNDER OTHER DOCUMENTS, CALLED CONSENT TO TRIAL BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE OR DISTRICT JUDGE. If the parties elect to have the case assigned to a District Judge, Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan will continue to manage the case as provided for in Local Rule 72G. Any party who has filed a Consent to Trial by a Magistrate Judge or District Judge or a District Judge Option does not need to refile it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 05/25/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Form) (jmb)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to Writ of Habeas Corpus Volume III re #8 Answer to Writ by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 29-30, #2 Exhibit 31-33, #3 Exhibit 34-35, #4 Exhibit 36-40, #5 Exhibit 41-44, #6 Exhibit 45, #7 Exhibit 46-48, #8 Exhibit 49, #9 Exhibit 50-55) (Wabby, Ronald)
May 24, 2022 Filing 9 ANSWER to Writ of Habeas Corpus Volume II re #8 Answer to Writ by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Exhibit 5-8, #3 Exhibit 9-17, #4 Exhibit 18, #5 Exhibit 19-20, #6 Exhibit 21-24, #7 Exhibit 25-26, #8 Exhibit 27, #9 Exhibit 28) (Wabby, Ronald)
May 24, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to Writ of Habeas Corpus Volume I re #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Wabby, Ronald)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Wabby, Ronald)
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald M. Wabby, Jr on behalf of ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA, DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA. (Wabby, Ronald)
May 2, 2022 Filing 5 Remark: Service copies were forwarded to the U.S. Marshal. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmb)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING that the United States Marshal shall make service of this order, together with a copy of the (ECF. No. #3 ) Petition for Writ of Habeas upon the respondents, David Bobby, Warden of the Northeast Ohio Correctional Center, the Attorney General of Pennsylvania as well as the District Attorney of Allegheny County, with costs to be advanced by the United States. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of service of this order, respondents shall respond to the allegations of the petition for writ of habeas corpus. The District Attorney shall address both the merits of the petition and exhaustion of state court remedies. The answer shall comply with the requirements of Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. The District Attorney shall furnish this court with the state court records, including all relevant transcripts, all briefs filed by petitioner, and all written opinions of the courts. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties are allowed fourteen (14) days from this date to appeal this order to a district judge pursuant to Rule 72.C.2 of the Local Rules. Failure to appeal within fourteen (14) days will constitute waiver of the right to appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisa Pupo Lenihan on 05/02/2022. (jmb)
April 26, 2022 Filing 3 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $5, receipt number 24668074652) filed by JOSHUA WILLIAMS. (jd)
April 26, 2022 Filing 2 Habeas Filing fee: $5.00, receipt number 24668074652 (jd)
April 18, 2022 Filing 1 Remark: Habeas Petition lodged without Motion for In Forma Pauperis or payment of filing fee (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSHUA WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ATTORNEY GENERAL OF PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Ronald M. Wabby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: PENNSYLVANIA
Represented By: Ronald M. Wabby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DISTRICT ATTORNEY OF ALLEGHENY COUNTY
Represented By: Ronald M. Wabby, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?