BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al v. PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Plaintiff: BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, MIKE SLATER, STACEY SLATER, LANCE SLATER, CURTIS SCHNUR, LYRIC SCHNUR, MAC SCHNUR, ELLEN ELLIOTT, BERNIE ELLIOTT, LITA GRAEF and MICHAEL GRAEF
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv00583
Filed: April 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Referring Judge: W Scott Hardy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 cr Notice of Removal - Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Filing 17 BRIEF in Opposition re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, BERNIE ELLIOTT, ELLEN ELLIOTT, LITA GRAEF, MICHAEL GRAEF, CURTIS SCHNUR, LYRIC SCHNUR. (Breth, Thomas)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Same. The page limit applicable to #13 Defendant's Brief in Support of its Motion to Dismiss is extended to 35 pages and the Court accepts the previously filed Brief as is. Likewise, the page limitation of any opposition brief filed by Plaintiffs is extended to 35 pages. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 6/7/2022. (kas)
June 6, 2022 Filing 15 BRIEF in Support re #14 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Defendant's Brief in Support of its Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Same filed by PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Boynton, Alan)
June 6, 2022 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit of Defendant's Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition to Same by PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order) (Boynton, Alan)
May 27, 2022 Filing 13 BRIEF in Support re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Appendix to Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss) (Boynton, Alan) Modified on 5/31/2022 to simplify entry (jv).
May 27, 2022 Filing 12 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #11 Amended Complaint, by PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Proposed Order) (Boynton, Alan) Modified on 5/31/2022 to simplify entry (jv).
May 11, 2022 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION answer due 5/27/2022, filed by STACEY SLATER; BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT; MIKE SLATER; CURTIS SCHNUR; LYRIC SCHNUR; MAC SCHNUR; LANCE SLATER; ELLEN ELLIOTT; MICHAEL GRAEF; BERNIE ELLIOTT; LITA GRAEF. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit) (Breth, Thomas)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER approving #9 Stipulation. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint on or before 5/11/2022. Defendant shall file a response to the amended complaint on or before 5/27/2022. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 4/27/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kas)
April 27, 2022 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #4 Order by PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Boynton, Alan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 8 Errata re #7 Notice of Appearance of Jordan P. Shuber by BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, CURTIS SCHNUR, LYRIC SCHNUR, MAC SCHNUR, LANCE SLATER, MIKE SLATER, STACEY SLATER. Reason for Correction: Wrong Attorney Listed on Document. (Shuber, Jordan)
April 25, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan P. Shuber on behalf of BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT, CURTIS SCHNUR, LYRIC SCHNUR, MAC SCHNUR, LANCE SLATER, MIKE SLATER, STACEY SLATER. (Shuber, Jordan)
April 22, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle R. Koerbel on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Koerbel, Rochelle)
April 22, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Dana Windisch Chilson on behalf of PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Chilson, Dana)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER on Motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b). See attached Order for further details. Signed by Judge W. Scott Hardy on 04/21/2022. (dms)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that the instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the Stipulation of selecting an ADR process and Neutral. Counsel for plaintiffs (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (dms)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Judge David S. Cercone no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge David S. Cercone on 4/21/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (kly)
April 21, 2022 Judge W. Scott Hardy added. (ijh)
April 20, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Butler County, case number 22-10193 (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7061810), filed by PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Including Complaint filed at State Court, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3) (jv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT et al v. PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BUTLER AREA SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE SLATER
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY SLATER
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LANCE SLATER
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS SCHNUR
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYRIC SCHNUR
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAC SCHNUR
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Represented By: Thomas W. King, III
Represented By: Jordan P. Shuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELLEN ELLIOTT
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNIE ELLIOTT
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LITA GRAEF
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL GRAEF
Represented By: Thomas E. Breth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENNSYLVANIA INTERSCHOLASTIC ATHLETIC ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Alan R. Boynton, Jr.
Represented By: Brian H. Simmons
Represented By: Dana Windisch Chilson
Represented By: Rochelle R. Koerbel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?