Wepay Global Payments LLC v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Wepay Global Payments LLC
Defendant: PNC Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00592
Filed: April 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/1/2022. (bjl)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION PNC's Motion to Dismiss will be granted. As the Court deems any amendment futile, WPG's Complaint will be dismissed with prejudice. A separate order will follow. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 6/1/2022. (bjl)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PNC Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vose, Gregory)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Vose on behalf of PNC Bank N.A.. (Vose, Gregory)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Brennan on behalf of PNC Bank N.A.. (Brennan, Christopher)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER Defendant's Reply Brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss #12 shall be filed on or before May 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/22/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. (bjl)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE available #Here. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/21/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF do cument will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:21-cv-05052. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania the electronic record. (jh, )
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM Opinion: The Court grants PNC's Motion to Transfer Venue #8 . The Clerk is ordered to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Civil case terminated. It is so ordered. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 4/5/2022. Mailed notice(vcf, )
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY by Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. to motion to transfer case #8 , memorandum in support of motion #9 , declaration #10 (Hultquist, James)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant PNC Bank, N.A.'s motion for leave to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss Plaintiff's complaint at the appropriate time #19 is granted. Motion hearing set for 2/8/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of motion for leave to file #19 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 2/8/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Hultquist, James)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION by Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. for leave to file A Reply in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Hultquist, James)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM by Wepay Global Payments LLC in Opposition to motion to transfer case #8 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Wepay EXHIBIT A with Exs 1, 2, 3, and 4)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM by Wepay Global Payments LLC in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Grecia Decl. w/ Prior Art Attached))(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Defendant PNC Bank, N.A.'s motion to transfer venue under 28 U.S.C. section 1404(A) #8 is entered and briefed as follows: Response is due by 1/26/2022; Reply is due by 2/9/2022. Court will rule by mail. Proposed order #14 is improperly filed as a motion. Motion hearing set for 1/11/2022 is stricken. Mailed notice (vcf, )
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/11/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Hultquist, James)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION by Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. for order Proposed Order (Hultquist, James)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM by PNC Bank, N.A. in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hultquist, James)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (Hultquist, James)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Motion by James Terrence Hultquist for presentment of motion to transfer case #8 before Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 1/11/2022 at 09:30 AM. (Hultquist, James)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION regarding motion to transfer case #8 (Hultquist, James)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by PNC Bank, N.A. in support of motion to transfer case #8 (Hultquist, James)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION by Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. to transfer case (Hultquist, James)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. by James Terrence Hultquist (Hultquist, James)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Wepay Global Payments LLC. PNC Bank, N.A. waiver sent on 11/5/2021, answer due 1/4/2022. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC regarding Complaint and Summons to PNC Bank, N.A. served on Quincy Rochester on 10/12/2021 (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAILED PATENT report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (txl, )
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant PNC Bank, N.A. (ak, )
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Wepay Global Payments LLC by Matthew Michael Wawrzyn (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Wepay Global Payments LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18700251. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (lma, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wepay Global Payments LLC v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wepay Global Payments LLC
Represented By: Matthew Michael Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PNC Bank N.A.
Represented By: James Terrence Hultquist
Represented By: Christopher R. Brennan
Represented By: Gregory Vose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?