THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION v. COOK MYOSITE, INC.
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Defendant: COOK MYOSITE, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv00717
Filed: May 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Christy Criswell Wiegand
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #28 Motion for Shovon Ashraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/7/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Huiya Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/7/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 6, 2022 Filing 28 MOTION for attorney Shovon Ashraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7184025) by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Shovon Ashraf in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (with Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order) (Ashraf, Shovon)
July 6, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION for attorney Huiya Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7183832) by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Huiya Wu in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (with Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Proposed Order) (Wu, Huiya)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #22 Motion for Laura Lydigsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING #21 Motion for Raija Horstman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion for Valerie Goo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #19 Motion for Ryan Henry Seewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 7/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
July 5, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for attorney Laura Lydigsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7181101) by COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Envelope A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Lydigsen, Laura)
July 1, 2022 Filing 21 MOTION for attorney Raija Horstman to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7180264) by COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Raija Horstman In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice; Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Horstman, Raija)
July 1, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Valerie Goo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7180250) by COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Valerie Goo In Support Of Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice; Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice) (Goo, Valerie)
July 1, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION for attorney Ryan Henry Seewald to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7180223), by COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Seewald, Ryan) Modified on 7/5/2022 (ijh).
June 9, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin M. Eddy on behalf of COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Eddy, Kevin)
June 9, 2022 Filing 17 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Eddy, Kevin)
June 9, 2022 Filing 16 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by COOK MYOSITE, INC. Answer due from COOK MYOSITE, INC. on 7/25/2022. (Eddy, Kevin)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #13 Motion for attorney Shovon Ashraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion and the affidavit do not provide all the information required by Local Civil Rule for the Western District of Pennsylvania 83.2.B. Attorney Shovon Ashraf should refer to Local Civil Rule 83.2.B and the forms found in the Appendix 83.2.B of the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/2/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #12 Motion for attorney Huiya Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion and the affidavit do not provide all the information required by Local Civil Rule for the Western District of Pennsylvania 83.2.B. Attorney Huiya Wu should refer to Local Civil Rule 83.2.B and the forms found in the Appendix 83.2.B of the Local Civil Rules. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 6/2/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
June 1, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Shovon Ashraf to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7132120) by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Shovon Ashraf) (Ashraf, Shovon)
June 1, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Huiya Wu to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7131600) by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Huiya Wu) (Wu, Huiya)
May 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Summerfield's Motion is hereby GRANTED and her and her firm's appearances on behalf Defendant COOK MYOSITE, INC. are WITHDRAWN. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/25/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
May 24, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Summerfield, Victoria)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING #8 Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. Pursuant to Local Rule of Civil Procedure 83.2(C)(4), "[i]n any civil proceeding, no attorney whose appearance has been entered shall withdraw his or her appearance except upon filing a written motion. The motion must specify the reasons requiring withdrawal and provide the name and address of the succeeding attorney. If the succeeding attorney is not known, the motion must set forth the name, address, and telephone number of the client and either bear the client's signature approving withdrawal or state specifically why, after due diligence, the attorney was unable to obtain the client's signature." Attorney Summerfield's Notice of Withdrawal does not conform to the requirements of the Local Rule and is, therefore, STRICKEN. Attorney Summerfield may file a compliant motion to withdraw her appearance for the Court's consideration. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/23/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
May 23, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 Notice. ERROR: Withdrawal of Appearance was filed as a Notice. CORRECTION: Per Local Rule 83.2 C.4, a Withdrawal of Appearance must be filed as a motion. Attorney is to retitle the document as a Motion to Withdraw Appearance and refile it using Withdraw as Attorney under Motions, with the motion as the main document and a proposed order as an attachment. (ijh)
May 20, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by COOK MYOSITE, INC. (Summerfield, Victoria) Modified to hide document from public view per 9 Order on 5/23/2022 (jmm).
May 20, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Victoria D. Summerfield on behalf of COOK MYOSITE, INC.. (Summerfield, Victoria)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. The parties are hereby advised that the undersigned's husband is an adjunct faculty member at the University of Pittsburgh School of Law who periodically teaches courses at the University's School of Law. The undersigned is confident in her ability to remain fair and impartial in this proceeding. However, if any party objects to the undersigned continuing to preside over this case, that party shall file a motion for undersigned's recusal on or before close of business on 5/23/2022. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/16/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
May 16, 2022 Filing 4 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this Notice. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jmm)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) Motions to Dismiss as more fully stated in said order. Signed by Judge Christy Criswell Wiegand on 5/16/2022. (jmm)
May 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff shall make service of the notice on all parties. (jmm)
May 13, 2022 Filing 6 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (ijh)
May 13, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against COOK MYOSITE, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7100960), filed by THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ijh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION v. COOK MYOSITE, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Represented By: Shannon Huygens
Represented By: Huiya Wu
Represented By: Shovon Ashraf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COOK MYOSITE, INC.
Represented By: Kevin M. Eddy
Represented By: Laura Lydigsen
Represented By: Raija J Horstman
Represented By: Ryan Henry Seewald
Represented By: Valerie Goo
Represented By: Victoria D. Summerfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?