GNC HOLDINGS, LLC v. JIANG, et al
Plaintiff: GNC HOLDINGS, LLC
Defendant: LI JIANG and JOHN DOES 1-10
Case Number: 2:2022cv00762
Filed: May 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. LI JIANG served on 7/14/2022, answer due 8/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Motley, Martha)
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Alternative Service of Process. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 7/12/2022. (lmg)
July 11, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support re #6 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (Brief in Support of Motion for Alternative Service of Process) filed by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Motley, Martha)
July 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Alternative Service of Process by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Motley, Martha)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), this Court hereby recuses itself as to all matters of the above-captioned case and requests that this case be assigned to another member of the Court. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 5/26/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lck)
May 26, 2022 Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (pak)
May 25, 2022 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement identifying ZT Pharmaceutical LLC as corporate parent or other affiliate, by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (Motley, Martha)
May 25, 2022 Filing 3 PATENT/TRADEMARK DOCUMENTS ISSUED. (sdp)
May 25, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to LI JIANG (sdp)
May 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LI JIANG (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC 7117587), filed by GNC HOLDINGS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sdp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GNC HOLDINGS, LLC v. JIANG, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GNC HOLDINGS, LLC
Represented By: Martha Brewer Motley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LI JIANG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?