ISALY'S et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ISALY'S and RACHNA ANWAR
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2022cv00810
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William S Stickman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 7 U.S.C. ยง 202
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2022 Filing 7 STIPULATION Staying Plaintiff's Disqualification from the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program Pending Final Disposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Wilk, Ryan)
June 10, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan J. Wilk on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Wilk, Ryan)
June 6, 2022 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (dmh)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Jeremy G. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge William S. Stickman on 06/03/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (rgm)
June 3, 2022 Filing 3 PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by RACHNA ANWAR, ISALY'S (Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
June 3, 2022 Filing 2 First MOTION for attorney Jeremy G. Feigenbaum to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7136324) by RACHNA ANWAR, ISALY'S. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affirmation in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Feigenbaum, Jeremy)
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7134996), filed by ISALY'S and RACHNA ANWAR. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (dmh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ISALY'S et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISALY'S
Represented By: Jeremy G Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHNA ANWAR
Represented By: Jeremy G Feigenbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Ryan J. Wilk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?