STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY v. NOCRY, LLC
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Defendant: NOCRY, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00988
Filed: July 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: David S Cercone
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (kak)
August 17, 2022 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. NOCRY, LLC waiver sent on 8/9/2022, answer due 10/11/2022. (Adkins, Meghan)
July 25, 2022 Filing 6 Errata re #4 Amended Complaint by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. Reason for Correction: Correcting incompletely amended complaint. (Adkins, Meghan)
July 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan K. Adkins on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Adkins, Meghan)
July 21, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NOCRY, LLC, filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (Rosenberg, David) Refiled at #6 . Document hidden from public view. Modified on 7/25/2022 (cww).
July 7, 2022 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement identifying State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company as corporate parent or other affiliate, by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Rosenberg, David) Modified on 7/7/2022 (pak).
July 6, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NOCRY, LLC (pak)
July 6, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NOCRY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7183171), filed by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (pak)
July 6, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1 Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 7/13/2022. (pak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY v. NOCRY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY
Represented By: David J. Rosenberg
Represented By: Meghan K. Adkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOCRY, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?