HASSON v. PARTS ID, INC.
Plaintiff: KENNETH HASSON
Defendant: PARTS ID, INC.
Case Number: 2:2022cv01291
Filed: September 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #30 STIPULATION of Dismissal by KENNETH HASSON. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 7/11/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
July 11, 2023 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal by KENNETH HASSON. (Colella, Nicholas)
April 14, 2023 Filing 29 REPORT of Mediation: Case has not resolved. CAROLE KATZ terminated. The parties are reminded of their obligation to complete the ADR questionnaire and submit within 5 days of the conclusion of the ADR process. The questionnaire can be accessed #here or at www.pawd.uscourts.gov. Click on the ADR icon. Mediation session was held on 4/13/2023. (Katz, Carole)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 3/15/23. (tk)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and Order for the Production of Documents and ESI by KENNETH HASSON. (Colella, Nicholas)
February 14, 2023 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2023. (Court Reporter: none) (tk)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Implementing Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Pursuant to LCvR 16.1.D. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 2/14/23. (tk)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Carole Katz, Esquire is appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 2/14/23. (tk)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/16/2023; Joinder of Parties due by 3/16/2023; Fact Discovery due by 1/26/2024; Class Certification Motion due by 10/18/2023; Response to Motion due by 12/4/2023; Reply brief due by 12/27/2023; Plaintiff Expert Reports due by 2/26/2024; Defendant Expert Reports due by 3/26/2024; Expert Depositions to be completed by 5/27/2024; Expert Discovery to be completed by 5/27/2024; Telephonic Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 6/13/2024 at 09:00 AM via Telephone Conference before Judge Robert J. Colville; Joint Pre-conference Statement due by 6/6/2024. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 2/14/23. (tk)
February 13, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Colella on behalf of KENNETH HASSON. (Colella, Nicholas)
February 13, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Sanchez on behalf of PARTS ID, INC.. (Sanchez, Thomas)
February 9, 2023 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT re: Joint Pre-Conference Statement by KENNETH HASSON. (Lynch, Gary)
February 2, 2023 Filing 19 AMENDED DOCUMENT by KENNETH HASSON. Amendment to #18 Stipulation Selecting ADR process. (Lynch, Gary)
January 31, 2023 Filing 18 STIPULATION selecting ADR process by KENNETH HASSON. (Lynch, Gary) Amended Document filed at #19 . Modified text on 2/3/2023. (keh)
January 31, 2023 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lynch, Gary)
January 4, 2023 Filing 16 Disclosure Statement by PARTS ID, INC. (Allen, Kevin)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 INITIAL LOCAL RULE 16.1 SCHEDULING ORDER:Telephonic Initial Case Management set for 2/14/2023 at 09:00 AM before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial In Information can be found at ECF #5 . Joint Pre Conference Statement due by 2/9/2023. ADR Stipulation and Rule 26f Report due by 1/31/2023. Details more fully stated in the order. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 1/3/23. (Attachments: #1 1: Stipulation Selecting ADR, #2 2: Rule 26(f) form) (cjo)
December 30, 2022 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement by PARTS ID, INC. (Allen, Kevin)
December 30, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by PARTS ID, INC.. (Allen, Kevin)
December 30, 2022 CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #13 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 1/6/2023. (jd)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer . PARTS ID, INC. answer due by 12/30/2022. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 12/1/22. (cjo)
December 1, 2022 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer PARTS ID, INC. Defendant's answer is due by 11/30/2022. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 10/31/22. (cjo)
October 31, 2022 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer PARTS ID, INC. PARTS ID, INC shall file an answer by 10/31/2022. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/29/22. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (cjo)
September 29, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
September 19, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by KENNETH HASSON. PARTS ID, INC. served on 9/9/2022, answer due 9/30/2022. (Lynch, Gary)
September 12, 2022 Filing 5 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES. Every Telephonic Conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled you will be instructed to refer back to this. This document has a security setting of "Case Participants Only," so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (cjo)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE: Rule 12(b) Motions (details more fully stated in said Order). Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 9/12/22. (cjo)
September 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE that instant civil action has been designated for placement into the United States District Court's Alternative Dispute Resolution program. Parties are directed to fully complete the required 26(f) report, which includes the stipulation of selecting an ADR process. Counsel for plaintiff (or in the case of a removal action, counsel for removing defendant) shall make service of the notice on all parties. (cjo)
September 9, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PARTS ID, INC. (keh)
September 8, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PARTS ID, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7283446), filed by KENNETH HASSON. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (keh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HASSON v. PARTS ID, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH HASSON
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Nicholas Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PARTS ID, INC.
Represented By: Kevin P. Allen
Represented By: Thomas E. Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?