POPA v. PSP GROUP, LLC et al
Plaintiff: ASHLEY POPA
Defendant: PSP GROUP, LLC doing business as PET SUPPLIES PLUS and MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Case Number: 2:2022cv01357
Filed: September 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: J Nicholas Ranjan
Referring Judge: Arthur J Schwab
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Case electronically transferred to District of Western District of Washington. (jma)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM ORDER granting #20 Motion to Transfer Case. This case shall be TRANSFERRED forthwith to the United States District Court for the Western District of Washington. Upon transfer, the Clerk of Court shall mark this case as closed. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 2/27/2023. (pak)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Second NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by MICROSOFT CORPORATION re #20 Motion to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Snell, James)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY BRIEF re #20 Motion to Transfer Case filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James Snell) (Papianou, John)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for an Order Maintaining Briefing Schedule and Staying Response Deadlines to First Amended Complaint. The briefing schedule set at ECF 18 on Microsoft's pending #20 motion to transfer shall remain in effect. Defendants' responses to the #26 Amended Complaint shall be filed within 21 days of the resolution of the motion to transfer, to be specified in a future Order of Court. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 12/14/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #29 Motion for Order Maintaining Briefing Schedule, Motion to Stay. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Stay Response Deadlines. This message is for informational purposes only. (jma)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Consent MOTION for an Order Maintaining Briefing Schedule on Defendant Microsoft Corporation's Pending Transfer Motion and Staying Response Deadlines to First Amended Complaint by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Papianou, John). Added MOTION to Stay Response Deadlines on 2/14/2023 (jma) Modified text on 2/14/2023. (pak)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #24 Motion for James G. Snell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 2/8/2023. (pak)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from MICROSOFT CORPORATION on 2/21/2023; PSP GROUP, LLC on 2/21/2023. (jma)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 BRIEF in Opposition re #20 Motion to Transfer Case filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Lynch, Gary)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against PSP GROUP, LLC D/B/A PET SUPPLIES PLUS and MICROSOFT CORPORATION, filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Lynch, Gary)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by PSP GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rockney, James)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for attorney James G. Snell to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7506428) by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of James G. Snell In Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Snell, James)
January 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by MICROSOFT CORPORATION re #20 Motion to Transfer Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Perkins v. Zillow Order) (Papianou, John)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #20 Motion to Transfer Case. Plaintiff shall file her brief in response to the #20 motion on or before 2/7/2023; Defendant's reply brief due by 2/21/2023. Brief in response shall not exceed 15 pages in length; reply brief shall not exceed 10 pages in length. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 1/17/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 BRIEF in Support re #20 Motion to Transfer Case filed by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Papianou, John)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Transfer Case by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Papianou, John)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Papianou, John)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for an Order Staging Briefing on Anticipated Motion to Transfer and Responses to Complaint. Microsoft shall file any motion to transfer on or before 1/13/2023. Defendants' responses to the #1 Complaint shall be filed within 21 days of the resolution of the motion to transfer, to be specified in a future Order of Court. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 1/9/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Consent MOTION Microsofts Consent Motion for an Order Staging Briefing on Its Anticipated Motion to Transfer and Responses to the Complaint by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Papianou, John)
November 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. MICROSOFT CORPORATION and PSP GROUP, LLC shall file their answer or other response to the #1 Complaint on or before 1/13/2023. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/29/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (pak)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint by MICROSOFT CORPORATION, PSP GROUP, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Papianou, John)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Nicola Menaldo to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 10/20/2022. (pak)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for attorney Nicola Menaldo to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7352595) by MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Nicola Menaldo, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Menaldo, Nicola)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Disclosure Statement identifying Wholly owned subsidiary of Franchise Group, Inc. as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PSP GROUP, LLC. (Rockney, James)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by MICROSOFT CORPORATION Answer due from MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Papianou, John)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John G. Papianou on behalf of MICROSOFT CORPORATION. (Papianou, John)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by PSP GROUP, LLC Answer due from PSP GROUP, LLC on 12/2/2022. (Rockney, James)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James L. Rockney on behalf of PSP GROUP, LLC. (Rockney, James)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Colella on behalf of ASHLEY POPA. (Colella, Nicholas)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. (av)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by ASHLEY POPA. MICROSOFT CORPORATION served on 9/26/2022, answer due 10/17/2022; PSP GROUP, LLC served on 9/27/2022, answer due 10/18/2022. (Lynch, Gary)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to MICROSOFT CORPORATION, PSP GROUP, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons PSP Group, LLC) (jma)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 455(a), this Court hereby recuses itself as to all matters of the above-captioned case and requests that this case be assigned to another member of the Court. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 9/26/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lar)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The Clerk of Court is directed to reassign this case to another member of the court for all further proceedings. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Nora Barry Fischer on 9/23/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (lyk)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Arthur J. Schwab added. (av)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MICROSOFT CORPORATION, PSP GROUP, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7309359), filed by ASHLEY POPA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: POPA v. PSP GROUP, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEY POPA
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Nicholas Colella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PSP GROUP, LLC doing business as PET SUPPLIES PLUS
Represented By: James L. Rockney
Represented By: John G. Papianou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICROSOFT CORPORATION
Represented By: John G. Papianou
Represented By: Nicola Menaldo
Represented By: James G. Snell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?