SMIDGA v. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.
Plaintiff: MALINDA A. SMIDGA
Defendant: SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.
Consolidated Plaintiff: Kayla Mandeng and Frances Curd
Case Number: 2:2022cv01578
Filed: November 7, 2022
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Marilyn J Horan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #59 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Frances Curd, Kayla Mandeng, MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/17/2023. (cel)
November 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 BRIEF in Opposition re #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Strike, filed by Frances Curd, Kayla Mandeng, MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined complaint) (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth) Modified text on 11/17/2023. (cel)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Strike. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed MOTION to Strike. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
November 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 TEXT ORDER Following initial review of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike First Consolidated Amended Complaint #57 , it is hereby ordered that any briefing on the Motion to Dismiss component is stayed until further order of court. Any response to the Motion to Strike component shall be filed on or before November 17, 2023. Any reply shall be filed on or before November 23, 2023. It is further ordered that any response to Defendant's Request for Judicial Notice #59 shall be filed on or before November 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/10/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE / Request for Judicial Notice by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. re #58 Brief in Support of Motion, #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhs. 1-10, #3 Exhibit Exhs. 11-20, #4 Exhibit Exhs. 21-30, #5 Exhibit Exhs. 31-40) (Feeney, Brian)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 BRIEF in Support re #57 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Strike First Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Feeney, Brian)
November 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Strike First Consolidated Amended Complaint re #53 Amended Complaint by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A) (Feeney, Brian)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION AND ORDER Upon consideration of the StipulationExtending the Page Limit of Filings Relating to Defendant's Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that said Stipulation is GRANTED. The parties may submit filings which relate to Defendants forthcoming motion to dismiss in excess of 25 pages, but not exceeding 40 pages. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/8/2023. (bjl)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 STIPULATION Extending the Page Limit of Filings by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER An Amended Complaint having been filed #53 , Defendant's Motions to Dismiss #50 are moot. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond on or before 11/9/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 10/27/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (bjl)
October 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT re: FIRST CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. answer due 11/9/2023, filed by Frances Curd; MALINDA A. SMIDGA; Kayla Mandeng. (Lynch, Gary)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #50 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Incorrect relief selected. CORRECTION: Changed relief from Motion to Dismiss to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This message is for informational purposes only. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #50 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Brief in Support. This message is for informational purposes only. (kss)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order W/ #50 BRIEF in Support re #50 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. (kss)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Proposed Order re #50 Motion to Dismiss by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Feeney, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. re #50 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10, #2 Exhibit 11-20, #3 Exhibit 21-30, #4 Exhibit 31-40, #5 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Consolidated Amended Complaint re #45 Amended Complaint by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rocky Wiggins) (Feeney, Brian). Added MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 10/12/2023 (kss)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Upon consideration of the Stipulation Extending the Page Limit of Filings Relating to Defendant's Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that said Stipulation is GRANTED. The parties may submit filings which relate to Defendant's forthcoming motion to dismiss in excess of 25 pages, but not exceeding 40 pages. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 9/27/2023. (bjl)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 STIPULATION Extending the Page Limit of Filings Relating to Defendant's Forthcoming Motion to Dismiss by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
August 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Motion for Jonathen Jagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 8/23/2023. (dmm)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for attorney Jonathen M. Jagher to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7846654) by Frances Curd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (Jagher, Jonathan)
August 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC., filed by Frances Curd, MALINDA A. SMIDGA, Kayla Mandeng. (Lynch, Gary)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #41 Motion for James Pizzirusso to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/12/2023. (dmm)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Steven Nathan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/12/2023. (dmm)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for attorney JAMES J. PIZZIRUSSO to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7778844) by Frances Curd, Kayla Mandeng. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO PHV, #2 Exhibit EX A Certificate, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Pizzirusso, James)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for attorney STEVEN M. NATHAN to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7778838) by Frances Curd, Kayla Mandeng. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit ISO PHV, #2 Exhibit EX A Certificate, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Nathan, Steven)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #37 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint by August 22, 2023. Defendant shall have 45 days from the filing of the Consolidated Amended Complaint to file its Answer or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint. In light of the consolidation of the three cases, #24 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 7/5/2023. (dmm)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 BRIEF in Support re #37 Motion to Consolidate Cases filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - C) (Feeney, Brian)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
May 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant's Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss and Reply in Support of its Request for Judicial Notice is due on or before June 30, 2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 5/22/2023. (dmm)
May 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Brief in Support of Motion, #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #18 Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Guyon, Rebekah)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant's Reply is due by 5/19/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 4/6/2023. (dmm)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #26 Notice, #25 Brief in Support of Motion, #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #18 Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to #26 Notice, filed by MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Lynch, Gary) Modified text on 3/28/2023. (cel)
March 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF in Opposition re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Huber v. Expedia Group, Inc. - Order of March 22, 2023) (Lynch, Gary)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's Reply is due by 3/24/2023. Plaintiff's Reply is due by 4/7/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/17/2023. (dmm)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 Brief in Support of Motion, #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #18 Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 3/14/2023. (dmm)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lynch, Gary)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #25 Brief in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-5, #2 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 BRIEF in Support re #24 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rockey Bruce Wiggins) (Feeney, Brian)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re #18 Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Leave to Exceed 25-Page Limit for Motion to Dismiss. Defendant may file a Brief not to exceed 30 pages in support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/22/2023. (dmm)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File For Defendant to Exceed 25-Page Limit For Motion to Dismiss by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER, by stipulation and agreement of the parties, Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is due by 2/24/2023. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/13/2023. (dmm)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. Answer due from SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. on 2/24/2023. (Feeney, Brian)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motions to Dismiss. As #18 Amended Complaint has been filed, Defendant's Motions to Dismiss are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 2/6/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (dmm)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. answer due 2/17/2023, filed by MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Lynch, Gary)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Document incorrectly linked. CORRECTION: Linked to #1 Complaint. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE. ERROR: MULTIPLE Relief Motion Filed as One Relief. CORRECTION: Attorney advised that Motions of this nature are to be filed using the Motion Event and clicking on all the reliefs sought in said motion. Clerk of Court added/docketed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #15 Motion to Dismiss. ERROR: Wrong event selected. CORRECTION: Re-docketed as Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE sent in error. Disregard this notice. (cel) Modified on 1/17/2023 (cel).
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motion to Dismiss by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. re #15 Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 BRIEF in Support re #15 Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint filed by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Feeney, Brian)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim re: #1 Complaint by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order) (Feeney, Brian) Modified on 1/18/2023 (cel). Added MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM on 1/18/2023 (cel). Modified on 1/18/2023 (cel).
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Feeney, Brian)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Jordanna Ishmael to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/22/2022. (dmm)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for attorney Jordanna Ishmael to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7454519) by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Order) (Ishmael, Jordanna)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Rebekah Guyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/21/2022. (dmm)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Mark Salky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 12/21/2022. (dmm)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Rebekah S. Guyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7454339) by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Rebekah S. Guyon, #2 Proposed Order) (Guyon, Rebekah)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Mark A. Salky to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7454215) by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Motion for Admission for Pro Hac Vice, #2 Proposed Order) (Salky, Mark)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #8 , #9 , and #12 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A AND identifying citizenship pursuant to FRCvP 7.1(a)(2), which took effect on December 1, 2022. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 12/28/2022. (av)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. Answer due from SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. on 1/13/2023. (Feeney, Brian)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Pollock-Avery on behalf of MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Pollock-Avery, Elizabeth)
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian T. Feeney on behalf of SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.. (Feeney, Brian)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS/Return of Service Returned Executed by MALINDA A. SMIDGA. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. served on 11/10/2022, answer due 12/1/2022. (Lynch, Gary)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER AND PROCEDURES ON CIVIL MOTION PRACTICE. Signed by Judge Marilyn J. Horan on 11/10/2022. (dmm)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. (av)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC. (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $402, receipt number APAWDC-7382220), filed by MALINDA A. SMIDGA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (av)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMIDGA v. SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALINDA A. SMIDGA
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Elizabeth Pollock-Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPIRIT AIRLINES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Kayla Mandeng
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Frances Curd
Represented By: Jonathan M. Jagher
Represented By: Steven M. Nathan
Represented By: James Pizzirusso
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Jonathan Marc Jagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?