Bee v. Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mikel Bee
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00593
Filed: April 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert J Colville
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 688 General Admiralty and Maritime Law
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: For the reasons discussed at the 4/18/2023 status conference, all current case deadlines are hereby vacated. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report proposing renewed case management deadlines by 6/30/2023, or ten days after the completion of scheduled mediation, whichever is later. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/18/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jel)
April 18, 2023 Filing 47 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert J. Colville: Telephonic Status Conference held on 4/18/2023. (Court Reporter: none) (jel)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Motion for Laura B. De La Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/17/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Matthew D. Shaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/17/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
April 17, 2023 Filing 44 MOTION for attorney Laura B. De La Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7643226) by Mikel Bee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order) (DeLaCruz, Laura)
April 17, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for attorney Matthew D. Shaffer to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7643181) by Mikel Bee. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Shaffer, Matthew)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Motion for Georges M. Legrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice.. Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/12/23. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (tk)
April 12, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Ferris, Devon)
April 12, 2023 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Watson, Dennis)
April 12, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION for attorney Georges M. Legrand to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-7635705) by CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing) (Legrand, Georges)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: A Status Conference is set for 4/18/2023 at 11:30 AM EST by telephone before Judge Robert J. Colville. Dial-in information can be found at #37 . Signed by Judge Robert J. Colville on 4/12/2023. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jel)
April 12, 2023 Filing 37 AT&T SCHEDULING NOTICE FOR ALL TELEPHONIC CONFERENCES - Every telephonic conference conducted will be via an AT&T call-in number which requires participants to dial-in and provide an access code. When a Telephonic Conference is scheduled, you will be instructed to refer back to this notice. This document has a security setting of Case Participants Only, so only those individuals will have access to view the document. (jel)
April 11, 2023 Filing 36 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-02894. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER AND REASONS granting #25 MOTION to Transfer Venue. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is transferred to the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Pennsylvania. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 04/10/2023.(ko)
March 10, 2023 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Mikel Bee re #25 MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(blg)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 3/10/2023. (blg)
March 10, 2023 Filing 32 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit)(Legrand, Georges)
March 7, 2023 Filing 31 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Mikel Bee re #25 MOTION to Change Venue . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(De La Cruz, Laura)
February 28, 2023 Filing 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 2/28/2023. ORDERED that the plaintiff shall file a response to the pending motion to transfer venue no later than 03/07/2023. Defendant may file a reply to plaintiff's response no later than 03/10/2023. All other previously scheduled deadlines remain in effect. (ko)
February 21, 2023 Filing 29 STATUS REPORT by Mikel Bee (De La Cruz, Laura)
February 17, 2023 Filing 28 STATUS REPORT by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. (Legrand, Georges)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING #26 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Change Venue. IT IS ORDERED that the submission date for the motion to transfer venue is reset for MARCH 8, 2023. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 2/15/2023.(pp)
February 14, 2023 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Change Venue by Mikel Bee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Laura)
February 7, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 2/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Submission, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A-Complaint, #4 Exhibit B-Answer, #5 Exhibit C-the Agreement)(Legrand, Georges) Modified text on 2/8/2023 (ko).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Trevor Matthew Cutaiar for Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 02/02/2023. (ko)
February 1, 2023 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Trevor M. Cutaiar as Additional Counsel of Record by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Legrand, Georges)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that a Status Conference will be held by telephone on 02/28/2023 at 10:15 a.m. Counsel shall comply as set forth herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 01/23/2023.(ko)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/28/2023 10:15 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 5/30/2023. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/12/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(blg)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 1/19/2023 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/16/2022. (ko)
December 15, 2022 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. (Legrand, Georges)
December 15, 2022 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Legrand, Georges)
December 14, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2023 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (blg)
December 13, 2022 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Answer to Complaint: Document filed in error and refiled at Rec. Doc. 15. See Rec. Doc. 15 for corrected document. (ko)
December 12, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Legrand, Georges)
December 12, 2022 Filing 14 **FILED IN ERROR--SEE REC. DOC. 15** ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc..(Legrand, Georges) Modified on 12/13/2022 (ko).
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew D. Shaffer. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/08/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
December 7, 2022 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-9690011) by Mikel Bee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Applicant, #3 Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Laura)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Set Aside Default re #7 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. FURTHER ORDERED that the entry of default is hereby set aside. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/07/2022. (ko)
December 5, 2022 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Set Aside Default re #7 Order on Motion for Entry of Default by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Legrand, Georges)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Kathryn Lynn Briuglio, Michael Thomas Neuner, Georges Legrand for Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/05/2022. (ko)
December 2, 2022 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Georges Legrand added to party Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Legrand, Georges)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Entry of Default as to Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. By Deputy Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Address of Defendant) (Copy to Defendant) (ko)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. by Mikel Bee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(De La Cruz, Laura)
September 6, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Delise, Bobby) Modified text on 9/7/2022 (ko).
September 2, 2022 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. served on 8/31/2022, answer due 9/21/2022. (Delise, Bobby) Modified text on 9/6/2022 (ko).
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. (cs)
August 25, 2022 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (mb)
August 25, 2022 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Campbell Transportation Company, Inc. (Prepayment of fee not required pursuant to 28 USC 1916) filed by Mikel Bee. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Laura Beatriz De La Cruz added to party Mikel Bee(pty:pla).(De La Cruz, Laura) Modified text on 8/26/2022 (cs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bee v. Campbell Transportation Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikel Bee
Represented By: Laura Beatriz De La Cruz
Represented By: Bobby J. Delise
Represented By: Jeannette Monet Delise Spegele
Represented By: Matthew D. Shaffer
Represented By: Laura DeLaCruz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAMPBELL TRANSPORTATION COMPANY, INC
Represented By: Georges Legrand
Represented By: Kathryn Lynn Briuglio
Represented By: Michael Thomas Neuner
Represented By: Trevor Matthew Cutaiar
Represented By: Dennis A Watson
Represented By: Devon F. Ferris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?